Rao v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: DR. PADMA RAO and Padma Rao
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE and CO., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and KIEFER KRAUSE
Case Number: 1:2021cv01361
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing previously set for 5/6/21 is stricken. (ca, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 5/4/21. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion to stay the discovery pending the ruling on the motion to dismiss #17 is granted. (ca, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The call-in number for the 5/4/21 motion hearing is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw== (ca, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 19 STATUS Report (Joint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kiefer Krause (Cedillos, Michael)
April 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Renee Cedillos for presentment of motion to stay #17 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/4/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Cedillos, Michael)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kiefer Krause to stay discovery (Cedillos, Michael)
April 23, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss #13 is due by 5/14/21; Defendants' reply by 5/28/21. No appearance is required on the motion. (ca, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Renee Cedillos for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/27/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Cedillos, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kiefer Krause in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cedillos, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kiefer Krause (Cedillos, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kiefer Krause by Christopher Mair (Mair, Christopher)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kiefer Krause by Michael Renee Cedillos (Cedillos, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 5/6/21 at 8:45 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 4/30/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. Mailed notice (cn).
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Padma Rao by Michael Steigmann (Steigmann, Michael) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 4/13/2021 (bg, ).
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Padma Rao as to Kiefer Krause on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (Steigmann, Michael)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Padma Rao (Steigmann, Michael)
March 31, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kiefer Krause (exr, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Supplemental) (Cedillos, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rp, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. by Christopher Mair (Mair, Christopher)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Cedillos, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. by Michael Renee Cedillos (Cedillos, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021 L 002567) filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18012304. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cedillos, Michael)
March 11, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rao v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE and CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Renee Cedillos
Represented By: Christopher Mair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIEFER KRAUSE
Represented By: Michael Renee Cedillos
Represented By: Christopher Mair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. PADMA RAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Padma Rao
Represented By: Michael Anthony Steigmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?