Riyanto v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Irfansyah Riyanto
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01475
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion to remand #14 is taken under advisement; response is due by 5/24/2021; reply is due by 6/7/2021. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Notice of motion date of 4/29/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. In view of the pending motion to remand, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise plead will be held in abeyance until the ruling on the motion to remand. The joint status report due on 6/3/2021 also is suspended pending the determination of whether the case will proceed in federal or state court. Emailed notice (cdh, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Floyd A. Wisner for presentment of motion to remand #14 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/29/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Wisner, Floyd)
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Irfansyah Riyanto in support of motion to remand #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wisner, Floyd)
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Irfansyah Riyanto to remand (Wisner, Floyd)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Irfansyah Riyanto by Floyd A. Wisner (Wisner, Floyd)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Irfansyah Riyanto by Alexandra Marie Wisner (Wisner, Alexandra)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 EMAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted to and including 5/24/2021. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report no later than 6/3/2021 that includes at least the following: (a) an agreed briefing schedule on any motion that Defendant files as a responsive pleading; (b) a proposed discovery plan, and (c) a statement in regard to any settlement discussions and/or any mutual interest in a referral to the Magistrate Judge for an early settlement conference. Notice of motion date of 3/23/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen A. Stetsko for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/23/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Stetsko, Kathleen)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer (Stetsko, Kathleen)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Rachel Elizabeth Constantino-wallace (Constantino-wallace, Rachel)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Mack Harrison Shultz, Jr (Shultz, Mack)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Daniel Thomas Burley (Burley, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Boeing Company (Larson, Bates)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Larson, Bates)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021 L 001695) filed by The Boeing Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18030422. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Larson, Bates)
March 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riyanto v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Mack Harrison Shultz, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Constantino-wallace
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Burley
Represented By: Bates McIntyre Larson
Represented By: Kathleen A. Stetsko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irfansyah Riyanto
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?