Lishman et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Vicki Lishman
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Inc Caterpillar, Crane Co., Atwood & Morrill, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Crown Cork and Seal Company, Paul J. Krez Company, IMO Industries Inc., Iowa Illinois Taylor Insulation, The J.R. Clarkson Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corp., C.H. Wheeler Manufacturing, Warren Pumps, LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Boise Cascade, L.L.C., Anchor Darling Valve Company, Cleaver-Brooks, American Phenolic, Burnham, LLC, York International Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, William Powell Company, The and The Nash Engineering Company
Counter Defendant: Nash Engineering Co., Inc., Flowserve US Inc., Alfa Laval Inc., Hardie-Tynes, Inc., The Gorman Rupp Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Columbia Boiler Coimpany and Aurora Pump Company
Cross Defendant: Tate Andale, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Honeywell International Inc., George Lishman, Morse-Tec LLC, FMC Corporation, Spirax-Sarco, Inc., Gardner Denver Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Amphenol Corporation, BAE Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. and AW Chesterton
Counter Claimant: John Crane Inc.
Cross Claimant: Grinnell LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01570
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Jeffrey Cummings
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Settlement Conference held on 9/7/2023. The Court had off the record conversation with both sides. Counsel is allowed to check the numbers with their clients and are to notify the Court by Monday, 9/11/2023 with either a request to close the case or to confirm that the February 5, 2024 trial date will proceed. Mailed notice. (ym)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: An in-person Settlement Conference is set for 9/7/2023 at 2:00 PM. By August 31, 2023, the parties are to submit to the courtroom deputy either a joint or individual statement briefly describing the status and potential settlement, including offers or demands that have been made. Persons with settlement authority must be present in-person or available by phone. Mailed notice. (ym)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 8/4/2023. Pretrial Order and motions in limine to be filed by 12/8/2023. Responses to the motions in limine to be filed by 12/13/2023. An in-person Pretrial Conference is set for 1/4/2024 at 11:00 AM. Jury Trial date of 2/5/2024 is confirmed by the parties and will stand. Parties have 7 days to contact the courtroom deputy if they wish to schedule a settlement conference before this Court or with Magistrate Judge Cummings. Per the minute entry #420 , Defendant Crane Co.'s motion to set a briefing schedule #416 and plaintiffs' motion to strike #418 are stricken as moot. Mailed notice. (ym)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 426 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Holcomb, Lawrence)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 425 NOTICE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Brian Taylor (Holcomb, Lawrence)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 424 NOTICE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Brian Taylor (Holcomb, Lawrence)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Brian Taylor (Holcomb, Lawrence)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Plaintiffs' Notice to Take Deposition of David P. Sargent Jr., PE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Holcomb, Lawrence)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Plaintiffs' Notice to Take Deposition of Jennifer Sahmel, CIH by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Holcomb, Lawrence)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 5/9/2023. Defendant to disclose expert report by 6/21/2023. Expert deposition to be taken by 7/21/2023. An in-person status hearing is set for 8/4/2023 at 10:00 AM. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. Mailed notice. (ym,)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: An in-person status hearing is set for 5/9/2023 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym,)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Motion and Memo in Support by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to Strike Defendant Crane Co.'s Brief in Support of its Motion for Leave to Disclose Expert Reports (Holcomb, Lawrence) Modified on 4/12/2023 (rp, ).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 417 SUPPLEMENT to Notification as to Affiliates (Chimera, Vincenzo)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION by Defendant Crane Co. to set a briefing schedule Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Disclose Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Chimera, Vincenzo)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Stephen Ayres' motion to withdraw appearance #414 is granted. Attorney Stephen Richard Ayres terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MOTION by Attorney Stephen Ayres to withdraw as attorney for Crane Co.. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ayres, Stephen)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court having received correspondence from counsel confirming trial to be set by the Court at the earliest available date in 2024, tentatively sets the Jury Trial for 2/5/2024 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 412 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to status hearing,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, #409 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Crane Co.'s Oral Motion Seeking to Disclose Experts Nearly a Year Beyond the Close of Expert Discovery (Holcomb, Lawrence)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the amended stipulation for dismissal #410 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant Warren Punps, LLC only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 410 STIPULATION of Dismissal Warren Pumps LLC (Holcomb, Lawrence)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 2/27/2023. Oral motion by defendant Crane Co. for leave to disclose experts is entered. Plaintiff objects to the motion. Plaintiff to file a response by 3/20/2023. Defendant to file a reply by 4/3/2023. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crane Co. by Vincenzo R Chimera (Chimera, Vincenzo)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney James B. Walton's motion to withdraw appearance #406 is granted. Attorney James Billings Walton terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MOTION to withdraw from assignment pursuant to Local Rule 83.38 for Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Motion to Withdraw)(McCarthy, James)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 1/9/2023. Counsel for defendants Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., and Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. did not appear nor contact the Court. Counsel for plaintiffs reported that the parties are ready to proceed with a trial and would like potential dates to discuss with his clients. The Court did remind counsel that the parties may consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge Cummings, who may have trial dates available sooner than this Court. Counsel for defendants Goulds Pumps, Grinnell LLC, and York International Corporation stated that his clients will be settling the matter and he is awaiting his clients to confirm. An in-person status hearing is set for 2/27/2023 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 1/9/2023 at 9:30 AM is converted to proceed by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 1/6/2023 is stricken and reset to 1/9/2023 at 9:30 AM as an in-person hearing in courtroom 1241. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 12/19/2022. Defendants did not appear nor contact the Court. Plaintiffs' motion to set cause for trial #398 is stricken. In light of the Court having to proceed with a trial in a criminal matter that has been pending for longer than this case, the Jury Trial set for 6/5/2023 is stricken. If the parties need to proceed earlier to trial, the parties may file a Joint Consent to Proceed with the Magistrate Judge. The parties are to confer and notify the courtroom deputy via email as to whom they agree to proceed with for trial. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of plaintiffs' motion to set cause for trial #398 set for 12/19/2022 at 10:00 AM will proceed as an in-person hearing in courtroom 1241. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence King Holcomb for presentment of motion for new trial #398 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/19/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Holcomb, Lawrence)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman for new trial to Set Case for Trial (Holcomb, Lawrence)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation to dismiss #396 , this case is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation only. Defendant's motion for summary judgment #353 is stricken as moot. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 STIPULATION to Dismiss Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MEMORANDUM of Law of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1: Admiral David Sargent Declaration and Report, #2 Exhibit Attachments to David Sargent Report, #3 Exhibit Ex 2: Samuel Forman Declaration and Report, #4 Exhibit Ex 3: Elliot Branch Report, #5 Exhibit Ex 4: Military Specifications, #6 Exhibit Ex 5: Deposition Transcript of Richard Kradin)(Taylor, Tobin)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 RESPONSE by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation to Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Facts in Support of Their Opposition to Summary Judgment (Taylor, Tobin)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #392 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs as to Warren Pumps, LLC only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 STIPULATION of Dismissal Warren Pumps LLC (Holcomb, Lawrence)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' third unopposed motion #386 for extension of time to respond to Warren Pump's motion for summary judgment is granted. This is the final extension barring extraordinary circumstances. Response to the motion for summary judgment #356 to be filed on or before 9/12/2022. Defendant Warren Pumps LLC to file its reply on or before 10/3/22. Because plaintiffs do not move for an extension of time to respond to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's motion for summary judgment #353 , the deadline for that response remains 9/1/22. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman Part 2- Exhibits to Plaintiffs Additional Statement of Facts in Support of Their Opposition to Air & Liquid Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment regarding MOTION by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation for summary judgment #353 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-4, #5 Exhibit 1-5, #6 Exhibit 1-6, #7 Exhibit 1-7, #8 Exhibit 1-8, #9 Exhibit 1 (PART 1 OF 3), #10 Exhibit 1 (PART 2 OF 3), #11 Exhibit 1 (PART 3 OF 3))(Holcomb, Lawrence)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to motion for summary judgment #353 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 4-1, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 12-1, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 13-1, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17)(Holcomb, Lawrence)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to statement,, #354 Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Facts in Support of Their Opposition to Air & Liquid Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment (Holcomb, Lawrence)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 RESPONSE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishmanin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation for summary judgment #353 (Holcomb, Lawrence)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman for extension of time to file response/reply to Warren Pumps Motion for Summary Judgment (Holcomb, Lawrence)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: In light of the Court granting plaintiffs an extension to time to file their response to the motions for summary judgment #384 , defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation and Warren Pumps LLC to file their replies on or before 9/22/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to defendants Air & Liquid Systems and Warren Pumps LLC's motions for summary judgment #382 is granted. Response to the motions for summary judgment #353 , #356 to be filed on or before 9/1/2022. The Court also grants the request to exceed the page limitation to up to 30 pages for their response brief and is reciprocal to defendants. No appearance necessary on 8/25/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Notice of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's and Warren Pumps, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence King Holcomb for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #382 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/25/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Holcomb, Lawrence)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in support of motion #355 , memorandum in support of motion #357 , motion for summary judgment #353 , statement,, #354 , motion for summary judgment #356 , statement #358 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Holcomb, Lawrence)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' unopposed motions for extension of time to respond to Defendants Warren Pumps, LLC and Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's motions for summary judgment #379 and #380 are granted. Plaintiffs to file a response by 8/25/2022. Defendants to file a reply by 9/15/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to LR 5.3 and this Court's standing orders, all motions are to be noticed up for presentment before this Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in support of motion #355 , motion for summary judgment #353 , statement,, #354 Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Holcomb, Lawrence)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in support of motion #357 , motion for summary judgment #356 , statement #358 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Holcomb, Lawrence)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #377 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant Atwood & Morrill only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. dba Atwood & Morrill (Wacker, Brian)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit N-Report of Edwin Holstein regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit M-Dep of Richard Kradin regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit L-Dep of Edwin Holstein regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit K-Declaration of Foreman regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit J- Declaration of Branch (Part 2) regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit J- Declaration of Branch (Part 1) regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit I-Declaration of Sargent (Part 3) regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit I-Declaration of Sargent (Part 2) regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit I-Declaration of Sargent (Part 1) regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit H-Declaration of Doktor regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit G-USS Cony regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit F- Military Records regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit E- George Lishman Evidence Dep (Part 2) regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit E- George Lishman Evidence Dep (Part 1) regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit D-Discovery Dep of George Lishman regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit C-Fourth Amended Complaint regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit B-Notice of Removal regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 EXHIBIT by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Exhibit A-Complaint regarding statement #358 (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Warren Pumps, LLC's Statement of Material Facts STATEMENT by Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM In Support of Warren Pumps, LLC's Motion For Summary Judgment (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MOTION by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC for summary judgment (Hogan, Meggie)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MEMORANDUM by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation in support of motion for summary judgment #353 (Taylor, Tobin)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgement STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Kraft Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Lishman Deposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Sargent Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C Sargent Exhibits 1-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C Sargent Exhibits 1-3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C Sargent Exhibits 4-5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit d.1 Branch Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D.2 Branch Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E Forman Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F Holstein Deposition, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G Ott Deposition, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H Holstein Report)(Taylor, Tobin)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation for summary judgment (Taylor, Tobin)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages #351 is granted. The Court likewise permits Plaintiffs to file response briefs up to twenty five pages; however, the Court encourages the parties to not use extra pages if they are not necessary to make cogent arguments. No extra pages are granted for Defendant's reply. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MOTION by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC for leave to file excess pages in brief of support of dispositive motion (unopposed) (Hogan, Meggie)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The parties did not submit a joint status report regarding settlement by 6/20/22, therefore, the Court presumes, pursuant to the 6/7/22 minute order #348 , that the parties are not interested in scheduling a settlement conference. All matters related to this referral having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (cc, )
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Lawrence K. Holcomb's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #346 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #347 , which indicates that although the parties are amenable to a settlement conference, they are continuing settlement negotiations amongst themselves. If the parties are mutually interested in scheduling a remote video settlement conference with the Court in August or September of 2022, by 6/20/22, the parties shall submit a joint status report regarding settlement to this Court's settlement correspondence mailbox (Settlement_Correspondence_Cummings@ilnd.uscourts.gov). In their status report, the parties shall address the issues set forth in the first paragraph of the second page of the Court's Standing Order For Settlement Conferences and provide the dates that the parties are mutually available in August and September 2022 for a remote video settlement conference. The deadlines for the submission of settlement letters described in the Standing Order and the date for the settlement conference will be promptly set after the joint status report is received. Mailed notice (cc, )
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Zacharopoulos, Demetrios)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19530626. (Holcomb, Lawrence)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw appearance of Dana C. Simon #344 is granted. Attorney Dana C. Simon terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to withdraw Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Dana Simon (Simon, Dana)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #342 , which indicates that expert discovery is complete and that the parties have been engaging in ongoing negotiations amongst themselves. By 6/10/22, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth whether their negotiations are ongoing and advising the Court if they would like to schedule a settlement conference. Mailed notice (lma, )
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 CERTIFICATE of Service of Warren Pumps, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum of Elliott Branch by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation to dismiss #339 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs as to defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company only. Plaintiffs' agreed motion for trial setting #334 is granted. Jury Trial is tentatively set for June 5, 2023. Status hearing to set trial deadlines is set for 1/6/2023 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Berman, Gregory)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #337 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs as to defendant Tate Andale, Inc. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Tate Andale LLC (Grenzer, Louis)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Joinder by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation to Warren Pumps Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Elliott Branch (Taylor, Tobin)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 OBJECTIONS Warren Pumps, LLC's Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Elliott Branch (Hogan, Meggie)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki LishmanAgreed Motion for Trial Setting (Simon, Dana)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 OBJECTIONS Warren Pumps, LLC's Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Amanda Burns (Hogan, Meggie)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE TO TAKE THE TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CLANCY CORNWALL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant, Tate Andale's Exhibit A to its Objection., #2 Certificate of Service Defendant, Tate Andale's Certificate of Service of Objection, #3 Certificate of Service Defendant, Tate Andale's Certificate of Service of Documents.)(Walton, James)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE TO TAKE THE TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF KYLE DOTSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Tate Andale's Objection., #2 Certificate of Service Tate Andale's Certificate of Service.)(Walton, James)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Supplemental Responses by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation to Plaintiff's Amended Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Amanda Burns (Taylor, Tobin)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 4/11/2022. Counsel for plaintiffs reported to the Court that the depositions of plaintiffs' experts have been completed and defendants' experts are set to be deposed by the April 22, 2022 deadline. Dispositive motions to be filed by 6/30/2022. Responses by 8/4/2022, replies by 8/25/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take them under advisement. The parties are to look at the month of May 2023 and the first two weeks of June 2023 to set for trial. As this Court's website directs, the parties must provide courtesy copies in hard copy form of all substantive and/or dispositive motions, including the corresponding legal briefs and attachments. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 OBJECTIONS Warren Pumps, LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Dr. Steven Smith (Hogan, Meggie)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants defendant Alfa Laval's motion to dismiss #229 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/11/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Amended Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of David P. Sargent (Hogan, Meggie)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 OBJECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Tate Andale's Objection., #2 Certificate of Service Tate Andale's Certificate of Service.)(Walton, James)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 CERTIFICATE of Service AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION as successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.'S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (Taylor, Tobin)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Dr. Samuel Forman (Hogan, Meggie)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Responses and Objections by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation to Plaintiff's Amended Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Dr. Steven Smith (Taylor, Tobin)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE by Alfa Laval Inc. Alfa Laval Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Dr. Michael Graham (Shea, Rick)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Responses by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation to Plaintiff's Amended Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of David P. Sargent (Taylor, Tobin)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Objections by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation to Plaintiff's Amended Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Amanda Burns (Taylor, Tobin)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Objections by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENED NOTICE TO TAKE THE TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. SAMUEL A. FORMAN (Taylor, Tobin)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Responses and Objections by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENED NOTICE TO TAKE THE TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RICHARD ARNOULD (Taylor, Tobin)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re notice of filing #314 AMENDED Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Samuel Forman (Simon, Dana)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re notice of filing #312 AMENDED Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of David Sargent (Simon, Dana)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Samuel Forman (Simon, Dana)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Elliot Branch (Simon, Dana)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of David Sargent (Simon, Dana)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Kyle Dotson (Simon, Dana)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Michael Graham (Simon, Dana)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #305 . Plaintiffs served their Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures, including experts' reports, and depositions of plaintiffs' experts were completed. Defendants Air & Liquid Systems, Alfa Laval, Tate Andale and Warren Pumps servedtheir Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures to plaintiffs, including their experts' reports. Defendant Crane Co. failed to produce expert reports. The parties are in the process of scheduling deposition dates for defendants' experts. By 5/6/22, the parties shall file a joint status report confirming the completion of expert discovery and report whether they are mutually interested in scheduling a settlement conference with the Court. Mailed notice (cc, )
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 CERTIFICATE of Service for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's Third Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production (Taylor, Tobin)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Clancy Cornwall (Simon, Dana)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of John Spencer (Simon, Dana)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #303 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant John Crane Inc. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Defendant John Crane Inc. (Gamble, Pamela)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re notice of filing #299 Amended Notice to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Richard Arnould (date change) (Simon, Dana)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Amanda Burns (Simon, Dana)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Steven Smith (Simon, Dana)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Take the Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Richard Arnould (Simon, Dana)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 CERTIFICATE of Service Alfa Laval Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure by Rick C Shea on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Shea, Rick)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 CERTIFICATE of Service by James Billings Walton on behalf of Tate Andale, Inc. (Walton, James)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 CERTIFICATE of Service Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Taylor, Tobin)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 CERTIFICATE of Service by Cross Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Expert Reports (Hogan, Meggie)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tate Andale, Inc. by Stephen Richard Ayres (Ayres, Stephen)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crane Co. by Stephen Richard Ayres (Ayres, Stephen)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: By 3/23/22, the parties shall file a joint status report on expert discovery setting forth what expert discovery has been completed and what expert discovery remains. The parties are reminded of the expert discovery deadlines previously set by the Court #143 . Mailed notice (cc, )
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 2/4/2022. The parties report that they have been proceeding with expert discovery and are awaiting the Court's ruling on defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s motion to dismiss #229 . The matter being fully briefed, the motion to dismiss is taken under advisement. The Court grants Attorney Catherine L. Carlson's motions to withdraw #277 #285 . However, the Court reminds the parties of Local Rule 83.12, which states that attorneys admitted to the general bar may appear in association with a member of the trial bar in all matters but may not appear alone at trial or in testimonial proceedings. Attorney Catherine L. Carlson terminated. Status hearing set for 4/11/2022 at 9:30 AM to stand and will proceed as an in-person hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Third Amended Notice of Video Deposition (Taylor, Tobin)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #288 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant IMO Industries Inc. only. Telephone status hearing is set for 2/4/2022 at 10:00 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. with prejudice (Simon, Dana)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE of Correction re #285 and #286 (bg, )
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ATTORNEY appearance for Tate Andale, Inc. by James B. Walton (Walton, James) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 1/26/2022 (bg, ).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MOTION to withdraw appearance of Catherine L. Carlson by Tate Andale, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walton, James) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 1/26/2022 (bg, ).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Second Amended Notice of Video Deposition of Gerald Markowitz set for 2.4.22 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Correction re #276 (bg, )
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 OBJECTIONS Warren Pumps Subpoena Duces Tecum and Amended Notice of Videoconference Video Deposition of Commander David Ott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 OBJECTIONS by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to other #270 Air & Liquid Systems Subpoena Duces Tecum and Amended Notice of Videoconference Video Deposition of Dr Gerald Markowitz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 OBJECTIONS Warren Pumps Subpoena Duces Tecum and Amended Notice of Videoconference Video Deposition of Dr Richard Kradin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 OBJECTIONS by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to other #269 Air & Liquid Systems Subpoena Duces Tecum and Amended Notice of Videoconference Video Deposition of Dr Edwin Holstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 OBJECTIONS by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to other #271 Air & Liquid Systems Subpoena Duces Tecum and Amended Notice of Videoconference Video Deposition of Dr David Fractor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MOTION by Attorney Catherine L. Carlson to withdraw as attorney for Crane Co.. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Defendant, Crane Co.'s Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Catherine L. Carlson.)(Carlson, Catherine)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ATTORNEY appearance for defendant by James B. Walton (Walton, James) Modified on 1/18/2022 (bg, ). Modified on 1/18/2022 (bg, ).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 REPLY by Alfa Laval Inc. to response to motion,, #262 Alfa Laval's Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Shea, Rick)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Harold H. Hunter's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #273 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19053119. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #3 Notice of Good Standing TX Bar)(Hunter, Harold)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures by Dana C. Simon on behalf of George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Amended Notice of Video Conference/Video Deposition of David Fractor set for February 15, 2022 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Amended Notice of Video Conference/Video Deposition of Gerald Markowitz for January 26, 2022 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Amended Notice of Video Conference/Video Deposition of Edwin Holstein set for January 28, 2022 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Brady L. Green's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #266 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Objection to Corp Rep Dep by Tate Andale, Inc. (Carlson, Catherine)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19030432. for Brady L. Green (Taylor, Tobin)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 RESPONSE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to MOTION by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #229 (attachments group 4 of 4) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 5A, #2 Exhibit Ex 5B, #3 Exhibit Ex 5C, #4 Exhibit Ex 5D, #5 Exhibit Ex 5E, #6 Exhibit Ex 5F, #7 Exhibit Ex 5G, #8 Exhibit Ex 5H, #9 Exhibit Ex 5I, #10 Exhibit Ex 5J, #11 Exhibit Ex 5K, #12 Exhibit Ex 5L, #13 Exhibit Ex 5M, #14 Exhibit Ex 5N, #15 Exhibit Ex 5O, #16 Exhibit Ex 5P, #17 Exhibit Ex 5Q, #18 Exhibit Ex 5R, #19 Exhibit Ex 5S, #20 Exhibit Ex 5T)(Simon, Dana)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 RESPONSE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to MOTION by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #229 (attachments group 3 of 4) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 5 (2nd half))(Simon, Dana)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 RESPONSE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to MOTION by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #229 (attachments group 1 of 4) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 5 (1st half))(Simon, Dana)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 RESPONSE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to MOTION by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #229 (attachments group 1 of 3) (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Exhibits, #2 Declaration Declaration of Dana Simon, #3 Exhibit Ex 1, #4 Exhibit Ex 2, #5 Exhibit Ex 3A, #6 Exhibit Ex 3B, #7 Exhibit Ex 3C, #8 Exhibit Ex 3D, #9 Exhibit Ex 3E, #10 Exhibit Ex 3F, #11 Exhibit Ex 4A, #12 Exhibit Ex 4B, #13 Exhibit Ex 4C)(Simon, Dana)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM by York International Corporation against All Defendants Answer to Crossclaims. by York International Corporation(Tayyab, Julia)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM by Grinnell LLC against All Defendants Answer to Crossclaims. by Grinnell LLC(Tayyab, Julia)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM by Goulds Pumps against All Defendants Answer to Crossclaims. by Goulds Pumps(Tayyab, Julia)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Notice of Deposition of David Fractor set for 2.15.22 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Notice of Deposition of Edwin Holstein set for 1.28.22 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Notice of Deposition of Gerald Markowitz set for 1.26.22 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #233 indicating that Crane Co. produced the document repository index to plaintiffs; Crane Co. served supplemental objections and responses and additional documents to plaintiffs' request for production of documents; and that plaintiffs requested electronic documents previously produced to other plaintiffs' counsel. The parties remain in dispute over plaintiffs' Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 7 with plaintiff seeking supplemental responses or a verification of completeness and Crane Co. claiming that the responses are complete and were previously verified. To eliminate any remaining issue as to the completeness of its responses, Crane Co. shall serve a separate verification on plaintiffs affirming that its responses to the discovery requests at issue are complete by 1/6/22. See, e.g., Hansen v. Country Mut. Ins. Co., No. 18 CV 244, 2020 WL 5763588, at *3 (N.D.Ill. Sept. 28, 2020).Mailed notice (mjc, )
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #232 indicating that Plaintiffs' Interrogatory Nos. 10(A) and 12(A) and Requests for Production Nos. 28, 30-31, and 50 remain in dispute. In essence, defendant Tate Andale, LLC ("Defendant") refuses to respond to interrogatories that seek to have it confirm or deny assertions made by legally distinct entities (such as The Andale Company). Defendant is entitled to take this position so long as it has no knowledge as to what the other legally distinct entities would assert in response to the inquiries in question. With respect to the document requests, Defendant asserts that it has produced all responsive documents in its possession, custody, or control related to: (a) the lube oil coolers manufactured by The Andale Company related to the USS Cony (DD-508) and the Fletcher class destroyers to which the USS Cony belonged; and (b) the specifications, invoices, shipping documentation contracts, and/or purchase agreements related to the lube oil coolers manufactured by The Andale Company prior to 1963. Defendant objects to producing the drawings/blueprints related to remainder of the lube oil coolers manufactured by The Andale Company prior to 1963 and to producing documents created between 1964 and 1985 on the grounds that production of these additional documents would be unduly burdensome and not proportional to the needs of the case. The Court finds that Defendant's position on these disputed matters is reasonable. Nonetheless, the Court orders Defendant to meet and confer with plaintiffs prior to the scheduled Rule 30(b)(6) deposition to the extent that plaintiffs request assistance in locating particular responsive documents within Defendant's production. Mailed notice (mjc, )
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ANSWER to amended complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by John Crane Inc. against A.O. Smith Corporation, AW Chesterton, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Amphenol Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Atwood & Morrill, Aurora Pump Company, BAE Systems, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Boise Cascade, L.L.C., Burnham, LLC, C.H. Wheeler Manufacturing, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Columbia Boiler Coimpany, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corp., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Grinnell LLC, Hardie-Tynes, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Morse-Tec LLC, Nash Engineering Co., Inc., Paul J. Krez Company, Tate Andale, Inc., The Gorman Rupp Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., York International Corporation . by John Crane Inc.(Danhelka, Anthony)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ANSWER to amended complaint by York International Corporation(Tayyab, Julia)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ANSWER to amended complaint by Grinnell LLC(Tayyab, Julia)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ANSWER to amended complaint by Goulds Pumps(Tayyab, Julia)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ANSWER to amended complaint 4th amended complaint, CROSSCLAIM by Tate Andale, Inc. against Tate Andale, Inc. . by Tate Andale, Inc.(Carlson, Catherine)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ANSWER to amended complaint 4th amended complaint, CROSSCLAIM by Crane Co. against Crane Co. . by Crane Co.(Carlson, Catherine)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Fourth ANSWER to amended complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC(Hogan, Meggie)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Fourth ANSWER to amended complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(Berman, Gregory)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ANSWER to amended complaint (Fourth) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(Taylor, Tobin)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file additional pages in their response to Alfa Laval, Inc.'s motion to dismiss #243 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman for leave to file Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave for Additional Pages to Respond to Alfa Laval Inc's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Simon, Dana)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Merideth Snow Daly's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #240 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Crane Co.'s objections to plaintiffs' first amended notice of intent to take the videoconference/videotaped Fed R. Civ. P. 30(b0(6) deposition of Crane co., sued individually and as liable entity for Cochrane and Chapman and subpoena duces tecum #228 are entered and continued. Plaintiffs' response due 12/30/21. No reply unless ordered by the Court. The Court will review the parties' submissions and will either issue an order by mail or, if necessary, set a telephonic motion hearing. Mailed notice (cc, )
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18965165. (Daly, Merideth)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed plaintiffs and defendant Tate Andale, LLC's correspondence regarding the death in defendant's counsel's family and the agreed request for additional time to take Tate Andale, LLC's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. The Court expresses its condolences for counsel's loss and finds good cause to extend the fact discovery cut-off date to 1/11/22 for the limited purpose of completing this deposition. Mailed notice (cc, )
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. has filed a motion for a protective order to stay plaintiffs' deposition of its Rule 30(b)(6) witness which is scheduled for 12/10/21 and any other discovery during the pendency of its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. #234 . Plaintiffs have filed a response #236 and Alfa Laval has filed a reply #237 . This case was removed to this Court on 3/22/21 #1 . Since that time, Alfa Laval has answered discovery #118 , served Rule 26 disclosures #120 , answered the amended complaint #149 , and served supplemental answers to discovery [157, 192]. Finally, on 12/2/21, Alfa Laval filed a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction in which it asserts: (a) it is not incorporated in Illinois; (b) it does not have its principal place of business here; and (c) it has no contacts with this state that would create the exceptional circumstances necessary to establish that it is at home in Illinois and subject to general personal jurisdiction here [234 at 3-4]. These facts, presumably, would have been known by Alfa Laval back in March and its delay in asserting the motion to dismiss based upon them is unexplained. What is clear is that plaintiff served its Rule 30(b)(6) notice of deposition for this deposition on 11/17/21 [234-1] and that the deadline for completion of factual discovery is now eight days away on 12/17/21 #213 . In its discretion, the Court will provide Alfa Laval with a choice. It can either: (1) proceed with the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition tomorrow with the scope of discovery limited to jurisdictional matters as is proposed in its reply [237 at 4] and pay the incremental attorney's fees and costs that plaintiffs incur if its motion to dismiss is denied and plaintiff is forced to resume the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition to complete its questioning as to non-jurisdictional matters; or #2 it can proceed with the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition tomorrow with plaintiffs at liberty to pursue the full scope of their questions. Alfa Laval shall inform plaintiffs' counsel of its choice no later than 3:00 p.m. c.s.t. today (12/9/21). Defendant Alfa Laval's motion for a protective order is granted in part and denied in part on the terms specified above. Mailed notice (cc, )
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 REPLY by Alfa Laval Inc. to response to motion #236 for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Shea, Rick)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 RESPONSE by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to MOTION by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. for protective order #234 (Simon, Dana)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. by Rick C Shea (Shea, Rick)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Alva, Charles)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STATUS Report JOINT by Crane Co. (Carlson, Catherine)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 STATUS Report JOINT by Tate Andale, Inc. (Carlson, Catherine)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. by Alexandra Brisky Cunningham (Cunningham, Alexandra)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs to file a response to defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s motion to dismiss #229 by 12/30/2021. Defendant to file a reply by 1/13/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Madison Declaration, #2 Exhibit Disc. Dep Excerpt, #3 Exhibit Evid. Dep. Excerpt, #4 Exhibit AL Supp Int Resp Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Record, #6 Exhibit USS Coney Record)(Alva, Charles)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Objection to Plaintiff's by Crane Co. (Carlson, Catherine)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #224 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant Velan Valve Corp. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 FOURTH AMENDED complaint by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman against All Defendants (Simon, Dana)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 11/30/2021. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file amended complaint #215 is granted. Counsel is to electronically file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry on the case docket. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 12/21/2021. Presentment hearing set for 12/3/2021is stricken. An in-person status hearing is set for 4/11/2022 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Velan Valve Corporation (Simon, Dana)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 CERTIFICATE of Service (Carlson, Catherine)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 CERTIFICATE of Service (Carlson, Catherine)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion to reset hearing on plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint #220 is granted. Presentment of plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend complaint #215 set for 11/19/2021 is stricken and reset to 12/3/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to reset hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint #215 is set for 11/19/2021 at 9:45 AM by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Edward M. Newsom's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #217 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18856458. 21 01570 (Carlson, Catherine)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman in support of motion for leave to file #215 (Simon, Dana)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman for leave to file Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Certificate of Service - Plaintiffs' REVISED First Set of Interrogatories and REVISED Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Tate Andale, Inc. by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Telephone status hearing held on 11/4/2021 regarding the matters raised by the parties' joint status reports #194 and #195 . For the reasons stated in open court: With regard to #194 , counsel for defendants Crane Co., sued individually and as liable entity for Cochrane and Chapman, and Crane Co., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Cochrane, Inc., a/k/a Jenkins Valves, Inc. shall by 11/18/2021 confer with their client, supplement the responses to plaintiffs' Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 7 if need be, and serve a verification on plaintiffs affirming that the responses are complete. See, e.g., Hansen v. Country Mut. Ins. Co., No. 18 CV 244, 2020 WL 5763588, at *3 (N.D.Ill. Sept. 28, 2020). As to Requests for Production Nos. 10, 12, 13, 16, 21, 27, 32, 37, 39-40, 44, 50, 52, 56-57 and 59, defendants shall by 11/5/2021 provide plaintiffs with the index for the 9,245 boxes located in the warehouse in New Jersey. The parties are instructed to meet and confer to find a mutually agreeable date and time for plaintiffs to review the documents in the warehouse should plaintiffs seek to do so. With regard to #195 , for Interrogatory Nos. 7 15, plaintiffs shall serve revised interrogatories on defendant Tate Andale, LLC delineating out each separate entity into its own interrogatory by 11/5/2021 and Tate Andale, LLC shall respond to these revised interrogatories by 11/19/2021. Plaintiffs shall also revise and serve Interrogatory No. 17, limiting the scope of their request to a time period prior to 1963, on Tate Andale, LLC by 11/5/2021 and Tate Andale, LLC shall respond by 11/19/2021. As to the Requests for Production, plaintiffs have already agreed to narrow the scope of certain requests to documents concerning lube oil coolers prior to 1963. Plaintiffs shall also serve revised requests for production of documents on Tate Andale, LLC delineating out each separate entity into its own request by 11/5/2021. Tate Andale, LLC shall respond to these revised requests to produce by 11/19/2021 (with a verification if the production is complete). If Tate Andale, LLC raises the proportionality objection discussed in open court, the parties shall meet and confer to attempt to reasonably resolve the dispute. The parties are further instructed to meet and confer to confirm that plaintiffs have the full and complete copy of the asset purchase agreement referenced in the hearing. Plaintiffs' unopposed oral motion to extend fact discovery is granted. Fact discovery is now set to close on 12/17/2021. By 12/3/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report confirming that the parties have complied with this order and if they request an extension of the fact discovery completion date. If any disputes remain related to these discovery requests, the status reports shall include each parties' position on the remaining requests at issue. Mailed notice (cc, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 CERTIFICATE of Service by Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Second Supplemental Responses To Plaintiffs' Request For Production (Taylor, Tobin)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's First Discovery Requests (Simon, Dana)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: This case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 11/4/2021 at 10:30 a.m. to address the matters raised by the parties' joint status reports #194 and #195 . The parties should be prepared to discuss which of the matters remain in dispute. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to the hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 3997645. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ber, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 CERTIFICATE of Service Warren Pumps, LLC's Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Take the Videoconference/Videotaped Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Depositions by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 RESPONSE by Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Take the Videoconference/Videotaped Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Depositions (Taylor, Tobin)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Louis E. Grenzer, Jr.'s motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #206 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18803642. (Carlson, Catherine)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #204 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party as to defendant Caterpillar, Inc. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Caterpillar Inc. with prejudice (Simaytis, Julie)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Edward Joseph White's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #201 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 10/5/2021. Counsel for plaintiffs reports that the case is resolved with several defendants, including defendant. Four Rule 30(b)(6) depositions are scheduled. Parties are awaiting ruling from Magistrate Judge Cummings on two discovery motions. Telephone status hearing is set for 11/30/2021 at 9:30 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Parties should be prepared at the next status with dates to set trial. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18737903. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (White, Edward)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman by Demetrios T Zacharopoulos (Zacharopoulos, Demetrios)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Demetrios T. Zacharopoulos' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #197 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18717410. (Zacharopoulos, Demetrios)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 CERTIFICATE Of service (Carlson, Catherine)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STATUS Report Joint Status Report of Plaintiffs and Defendant Tate Andale, LLC by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STATUS Report Joint Status Report of Plaintiffs and Defendants Crane Co., sued individually and as liable entity for Cochrane and Chapman, and Crane Co., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Cochrane, Inc., a/k/a Jenkins Valves, Inc. by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Dana)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The in-person status hearing set for 10/5/2021 at 9:45 AM is converted to a telephonic hearing. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 CERTIFICATE of Service of Second Supplemental Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Charles Matthew Alva on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Supplemental Answers and Objections to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Second Supplemental Answers and Objections to Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit Verification, #4 Exhibit Transcript)(Alva, Charles)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Plaintiff and defendant Tate Andale's agreed request for an extension of time submitted to this Court's chamber's e-mail address is granted. Plaintiff and defendant Tate Andale shall file the previously requested joint status report #178 by 9/24/21. Mailed notice (yt)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 CERTIFICATE Of service Amended Discovery (Carlson, Catherine)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Tate Andale Initial Disclosure by Tate Andale, Inc. FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a)(l) (Carlson, Catherine)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production by Dana C. Simon on behalf of George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant John Crane, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production by Dana C. Simon on behalf of George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production by Dana C. Simon on behalf of George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed plaintiff's amended motion to compel responsive discovery and documents from defendants Crane Co./Cochrane and Crane Co./Chapman #176 , which reveals that those defendants have not provided certain discovery notwithstanding plaintiff's meet and confer efforts. Plaintiff's motion #176 is granted in part and entered and continued in part as follows. As soon as possible, but no later than 9/17/21, defendants Crane Co./Cochrane and Crane Co./Chapman shall (1) provide a verification of their interrogatory responses as required by Rule 33; and (2) provide any supplemental responses and responsive documents defendants are willing to produce following the parties' recent meet and confer discussions and plaintiff's arguments set forth in the motion. By 9/24/21, the parties shall file a joint status report confirming that defendants have complied with this order. If any disputes remain related to the discovery requests set forth in plaintiff's motion, the status report shall include defendants' position on the remaining requests at issue. The Court will then either set a hearing date to resolve any disputes or issue a ruling by mail. Plaintiff's initial motion to compel as to these defendants #175 is terminated as moot as it was later amended. Mailed notice (sxw)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw the motion to compel responsive discovery from defendant Warren Pumps #182 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to compel as to Warren Pumps #177 is terminated as moot. Mailed notice (sxw)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Warren Pumps, LLC's Second Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Requests For Production of Documents (Hogan, Meggie)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responsive Discovery and Documents from Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC [Doc 177] (Simon, Dana)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #180 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs as to defendant FMC Corporation only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION of Dismissal for FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Northern and Peerless Pump businesses (Alva, Charles)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court's 8/30/21 #178 minute order is amended to include the following. The privilege log the Court ordered defendant Tate to produce shall include: (1) the name and capacity of each individual from whom or to whom a document and any attachments were sent (including which persons are lawyers); (2) the date of the document and any attachments; (3) the type of document; (4) the Bates numbers of the documents, (5) the nature of the privilege asserted; and (6) a description of the subject matter in sufficient detail to determine if legal advice was sought or revealed, or if the document constitutes work product. See Pryor v. Target Corp., No. 20-CV-28, 2020 WL 6149569, at *2 (N.D.Ill. Oct. 20, 2020). Mailed notice. (jj, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed plaintiff's motion to compel responsive discovery and documents from defendant Tate Andale, Inc. #174 , which reveals that defendant Tate Andale has not provided certain discovery notwithstanding plaintiff's meet and confer efforts. Plaintiff's motion is granted in part and entered and continued in part as follows. As soon as possible, but no later than 9/10/21, defendant Tate Andale shall (1) provide its Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures as previously ordered by the Court #143 ; (2) provide a verification of its interrogatory responses as required by Rule 33; (3) provide any supplemental responses and responsive documents defendant is willing to produce following recent meet and confer discussions and in light of plaintiff's arguments set forth in the motion; and (4) provide a privilege log for any documents defendant asserts are being withheld as privileged as required by Rule 26. By 9/17/21, the parties shall file a joint status report confirming that defendant has complied with this order. If any disputes remain related to the discovery requests set forth in plaintiff's motion, the status report shall include defendant's position on the remaining requests at issue. The Court will then either set a hearing date to resolve any disputes or issue a ruling by mail. Mailed notice. (jj, )
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to compel Responsive Discovery and Documents from Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Simon, Dana)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to compel Amended Motion to Compel Responsive Discovery and Documents from Defendants Crane Co, sued individually and as liable entity for Cochrane and Chapman, and Crane Co. sued individually as successor-in-interest to Cochrane, Inc. a/k/a Jenkins Valves, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Simon, Dana)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to compel Responsive Discovery and Documents from Defendants Crane Co., sued individually and as liable entity for Cochrane and Chapman, and Crane Co. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Cochrane, Inc. a/k/a Jenkins Valves, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Simon, Dana)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to compel Responsive Discovery and Documents from Defendant Tate Andale, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Simon, Dana)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 CERTIFICATE of Service for Velan Valve Corp.'s Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents Propounded to Defendant Velan Valve Corp. by Richard Evan Daniels on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Daniels, Richard)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 CERTIFICATE of Service by Charles Matthew Alva on behalf of FMC Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Northern Pump First Supplemental Answers and Objections to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Northern Pump First Supplemental Answers and Objections to Requests for Production)(Alva, Charles)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s First Amended Responses to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Julie Ann Simaytis on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Simaytis, Julie)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 CERTIFICATE of Service Warren Pumps, LLC's Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Request For Production of Documents by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CERTIFICATE of Service by Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Case Specific Interrogatories (Taylor, Tobin)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. inadvertently filed its Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures as a motion. Docket No. #167 is terminated as a pending motion. Mailed notice (ma,)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION by Defendant Flowserve US Inc. for disclosure of Rule 26 Disclosures (Dely, Christopher)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Master Fact Witness List by Tate Andale, Inc. 21 01570 (Carlson, Catherine)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Master Fact Witness List by Crane Co. 21 01570 (Carlson, Catherine)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CERTIFICATE of Service IMO Industries Inc's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Hogan, Meggie)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 CERTIFICATE of Service Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce to Plaintiffs by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Interrogatories and Request to Produce to Plaintiffs by Anthony David Danhelka on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Danhelka, Anthony)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CERTIFICATE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by Richard Evan Daniels on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Daniels, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Crane Co. 21 01570 (Carlson, Catherine)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #158 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs as to defendant The J.R. Clarkson Company only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION of Dismissal of The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC (Rejano, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories and Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Answers and Objections to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit Verification)(Alva, Charles)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Rule 26(A) Disclosures by The J.R. Clarkson Company (Rejano, Joseph)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 CERTIFICATE of Service Defendant Velan Valve Corp.'s Answers and Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery by Richard Evan Daniels on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Daniels, Richard)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ANSWER to amended complaint by John Crane Inc.(Gamble, Pamela)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE by John Crane Inc. re MOTION by Defendant John Crane Inc. for disclosure Pursuant to F.R.CP 26(a)(1) #152 (Tivin, Mark)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION by Defendant John Crane Inc. for disclosure Pursuant to F.R.CP 26(a)(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def John Crane Inc.'s Notice and Designation of Expert and Lay Witnesses)(Tivin, Mark)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Flowserve US Inc.(Dely, Christopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ANSWER to amended complaint by FMC Corporation(Alva, Charles)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ANSWER to amended complaint by Alfa Laval Inc.(Alva, Charles)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Velan Valve Corp.(Daniels, Richard)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 CERTIFICATE of Service by Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.'s INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES (Taylor, Tobin)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Third Amended Complaint ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Tate Andale, Inc. against George Lishman . by Tate Andale, Inc.(Carlson, Catherine)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Third Amended Complaint ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Crane Co. against George Lishman . by Crane Co.(Carlson, Catherine)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CERTIFICATE of Service by Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report on discovery 157 . Plaintiffs have served their Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures, issued written discovery requests, and the deposition of plaintiff George Lishman has been completed. The Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule in part as follows. Defendants shall provide Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and propound written discovery requests by 8/6/21. Fact discovery shall be completed by 12/3/21. Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures are due 1/14/22. Plaintiffs' experts to be deposed by 2/15/22. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures are due 3/18/22. Defendants' experts to be deposed by 4/22/22. By 9/30/21, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth what discovery has been completed, what discovery remains, and whether any discovery disputes require the Court's attention. The parties may contact the Court's courtroom deputy at any time if they become mutually interested in scheduling a settlement conference with the Court. Mailed notice (cc, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ANSWER to amended complaint (Third) and Affirmative Defenses by Caterpillar, Inc.(Simaytis, Julie)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by York International Corporation(Tayyab, Julia)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Grinnell LLC(Tayyab, Julia)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Goulds Pumps(Tayyab, Julia)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CERTIFICATE of Service IMO's Answers and Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Hogan, Meggie)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC(Hogan, Meggie)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by IMO Industries Inc.(Hogan, Meggie)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CERTIFICATE of Service Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Answers and Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ANSWER to amended complaint THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(Berman, Gregory)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(Taylor, Tobin)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 CERTIFICATE of Service Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Gregory H. Berman on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Berman, Gregory)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ANSWER to amended complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by The J.R. Clarkson Company(Rejano, Joseph)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant John Crane Inc., Defendant John Crane Inc. by Anthony David Danhelka (Danhelka, Anthony)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 CERTIFICATE of Service by Warren Pumps, LLC of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CERTIFICATE of Service by IMO Industries Inc of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by Meggie Francine Hogan on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Hogan, Meggie)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE Of service (Carlson, Catherine)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #124 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant Iowa Illinois Taylor Insulation only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Iowa-Illinois Taylor Insulation Contracting, Inc. (Simon, Dana)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CERTIFICATE of Service by York International Corporation of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Tayyab, Julia)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CERTIFICATE of Service by Grinnell LLC of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Tayyab, Julia)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CERTIFICATE of Service by Goulds Pumps LLC of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Tayyab, Julia)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. of Rule 26 Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 26 Disclosures)(Alva, Charles)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CERTIFICATE of Service of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and its Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents by Justin A. Borawski on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Borawski, Justin)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answers and Objections to Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit Answers and Objections to Interrogatories)(Alva, Charles)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CERTIFICATE Crane Co.'s Certificate of Service of Discovery Responses. (Carlson, Catherine)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Simaytis, Julie)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Northern Pump Answers and Objections to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Northern Pump Answers and Objections to Requests for Production)(Alva, Charles)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant FMC Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answers and Objections to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Answers and Objections to Requests for Production)(Alva, Charles)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CERTIFICATE of Service by Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Defendant John Crane Inc. and Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents)(Gamble, Pamela)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 6/30/2021. Counsel for plaintiff reports that a third amended complaint has been filed, Rule 26 disclosures are complete, and interrogatories and answers have been propounded. An in-person status hearing is set for 10/5/2021 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Amartya Bagchi (Bagchi, Amartya)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 6/30/2021 at 9:30 AM will proceed by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 THIRD AMENDED complaint by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman against All Defendants (Simon, Dana)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint #80 is granted. Counsel is to electronically file the third amended complaint as a separate docket entry on the case docket. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman by Michael Loren Silverman (Silverman, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CERTIFICATE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by Julie Ann Simaytis on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Simaytis, Julie)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: The Court has reviewed the e-mail correspondence from defendant Velan Valve Corp. ("Velan") wherein plaintiff and Velan reached an agreement to extend Velan's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by 21 days, up to and including 7/26/2021. Consistent with the parties' agreement, the Court orders Velan to respond to plaintiff's written discovery by 7/26/2021. Mailed notice (cc, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant York International Corporation by Undray Wilks (Wilks, Undray)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grinnell LLC by Undray Wilks (Wilks, Undray)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Goulds Pumps by Undray Wilks (Wilks, Undray)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE by Julia Yasmin Tayyab of Change of Address (Tayyab, Julia)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorneys Shannon M. Harvey and Jennifer L. Smith's motions to withdraw appearance #96 and #97 are granted. Attorneys Shannon M. Harvey and Jennifer Lynn Smith terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #95 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs and fees to each party as to defendant The Nash Engineering Company only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION by Cross Defendant Honeywell International Inc., Defendant Honeywell International Inc. to withdraw Motion to Withdraw Appearance (Smith, Jennifer)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION by Cross Defendant Honeywell International Inc., Defendant Honeywell International Inc. to withdraw Motion to Withdraw Appearance (Harvey, Shannon)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION of Dismissal of The Nash Engineering Company (Borawski, Justin)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Flowserve US Inc. by Christopher Michael Dely (Dely, Christopher)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Due to entry #92 being entered in error, the Clerk's Office is directed to remove entry #92 forthwith. Mailed notice (cc, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Document withdrawn or removed per court order of 06/23/2021. (cc, ) (Main Document 92 replaced on 6/24/2021) (aee, ). Modified on 6/24/2021 (aee, ).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. (Alva, Charles) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 6/23/2021 (aee, ).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #89 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant Crown Cork and Seal Company only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. (Harris, Robert)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #87 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to each party as to defendant Honeywell International Inc. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Harvey, Shannon)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #85 , this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendant ViacomCBS Inc. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION of Dismissal of ViacomCBS Inc. (Kossmann, Claire)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: This case has been referred to this Court for discovery supervision and settlement. The parties are reminded that all fact discovery shall be completed by 2/04/22. By 7/15/21, the parties shall file a joint status report: (1) stating what discovery has been completed and what discovery remains; (2) identifying the remaining persons whom the parties intend to depose and include a proposed schedule for the completion of all remaining depositions; (3) stating whether there are any discovery disputes that require the Court's attention; and (4) stating whether the parties are interested in scheduling a settlement conference. Mailed notice (cc, )
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Warren Pumps, LLC (Hogan, Meggie)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman CORRECTED Exhibit to #80 (Simon, Dana)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman in support of motion to amend/correct #80 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Simon, Dana)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION by Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman to amend/correct Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint)(Simon, Dana)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cummings for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 5/24/2021. Fact discovery to be completed by 2/4/2022. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cummings. Judge Cummings has authority set and/or adjust any discovery deadlines. An in-person status hearing is set for 6/30/2021 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #76 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees as to defendant Gardner Denver Inc. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint as to Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cantieri, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gardner Denver Inc. by Michael H Cantieri (Cantieri, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The J.R. Clarkson Company by Thomas Joseph Burns (Burns, Thomas)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crown Cork and Seal Company by Robert P. Harris (Harris, Robert)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of voluntary dismissal #67 , this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendant The William Powell Company only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by George Lishman, Vicki Lishman (Simon, Dana)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Justin A. Borawski (Borawski, Justin)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Justin A. Borawski (Borawski, Justin)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Nash Engineering Company by Justin A. Borawski (Borawski, Justin)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal of The William Powell Company (Borawski, Justin)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant William Powell Company, The by Justin A. Borawski (Borawski, Justin)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Iowa Illinois Taylor Insulation by Kevin Patrick Horan (Horan, Kevin)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Appearance by The J.R. Clarkson Company (Burns, Thomas)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Attorney Appearance Form by Crown Cork and Seal Company (Harris, Robert)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Robert Leonard Shuftan (Shuftan, Robert)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane Inc. by Pamela Rose Gamble (Gamble, Pamela)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane Inc. by Mark I. Tivin (Tivin, Mark)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Michael B. Hunter's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #57 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Taylor, Tobin)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18246582. (Hunter, Michael)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International Inc. by Shannon M. Harvey Amended Appearance (Harvey, Shannon)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Velan Valve Corp. by Stephanie Frances Jones (Jones, Stephanie)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Appearance by The J.R. Clarkson Company (Rejano, Joseph)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice and with each party to bear their own costs as to defendant Union Carbide Corporation only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation by Brett Michael Mares (Mares, Brett)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation by Andrew J Roth (Roth, Andrew)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation by Tobin J Taylor (Taylor, Tobin)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tate Andale, Inc. by Catherine Lynn Carlson 21 01570 (Carlson, Catherine)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Union Carbide Corporation Plaintiff's Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (Sawyer, Jacob)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FMC Corporation by Charles Matthew Alva (Alva, Charles)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Berman, Gregory)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Gregory H. Berman (Berman, Gregory)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by IMO Industries Inc. (Hogan, Meggie)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane Inc. (Gamble, Pamela)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The J.R. Clarkson Company by Steven G. Carlson (Carlson, Steven)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Scott H. Koontz (Koontz, Scott)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Jacob D. Sawyer (Sawyer, Jacob)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliates by Caterpillar, Inc. (Simaytis, Julie)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International Inc. by Jennifer Lynn Smith (Smith, Jennifer)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International Inc. by Shannon M. Harvey (Harvey, Shannon)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Troyce G. Wolf's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #31 is granted. Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal #35 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party as to defendant Spirax-Sarco, Inc. only. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Spirax Sarco without Prejudice (Simon, Dana)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman by Troyce G. Wolf (Wolf, Troyce)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Christopher Thomas Gardino (Gardino, Christopher)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Velan Valve Corp., Cross Defendant Velan Valve Corp. by Richard Evan Daniels (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Daniels, Richard)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18187353. (Wolf, Troyce)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Julie Ann Simaytis' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #29 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18169669. (Simaytis, Julie)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spirax-Sarco, Inc. by Paul Michael Markese (Markese, Paul)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spirax-Sarco, Inc. by Daniel William McGrath (McGrath, Daniel)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation (Tayyab, Julia)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC (Tayyab, Julia)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps (Tayyab, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant York International Corporation by Julia Yasmin Tayyab (Tayyab, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grinnell LLC by Julia Yasmin Tayyab (Tayyab, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Goulds Pumps by Julia Yasmin Tayyab (Tayyab, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. by Charles Matthew Alva (Alva, Charles)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant The J.R. Clarkson Company by Joseph Philip Rejano (Rejano, Joseph)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM by York International Corporation against All Defendants . by York International Corporation(Tayyab, Julia)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ViacomCBS Inc. amended (Kossmann, Claire)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC by Meggie Francine Hogan (Hogan, Meggie)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant IMO Industries Inc. by Meggie Francine Hogan (Hogan, Meggie)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Dana C. Simon's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crane Co. by Catherine Lynn Carlson 21 01570 (Carlson, Catherine)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 appearance by Crane Co. 21 01570 (Carlson, Catherine)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Notice of Joinder, #2 Notification and Affiliates, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Carlson, Catherine)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18055919. (Simon, Dana)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman by Dana C. Simon Lead Counsel (Simon, Dana)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs George Lishman, Vicki Lishman by Klint Lee Bruno Local Counsel (Bruno, Klint)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 5/24/2021 at 10:00 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Defendant is directed to advise the Plaintiff of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit M, #11 Exhibit N, #12 Exhibit O, #13 Exhibit P, #14 Exhibit Q, #15 Exhibit R, #16 Exhibit S, #17 Exhibit T, #18 Exhibit U, #19 Exhibit V, #20 Exhibit W, #21 Exhibit X, #22 Exhibit Y, #23 Exhibit Z)(Kossmann, Claire)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ViacomCBS Inc. (Kossmann, Claire)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. by Claire Cooper Kossmann (Kossmann, Claire)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kossmann, Claire)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (21-L-000154) filed by ViacomCBS Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18045016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kossmann, Claire)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lishman et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Brett Michael Mares
Represented By: Andrew J Roth
Represented By: Tobin J Taylor
Represented By: Edward Joseph White
Represented By: Brady Lee Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Caterpillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Catherine Lynn Carlson
Represented By: Stephen Richard Ayres
Represented By: James Billings Walton
Represented By: Edward M Newsom
Represented By: Vincenzo R Chimera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal Company
Represented By: Robert P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Krez Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Meggie Francine Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Illinois Taylor Insulation
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J.R. Clarkson Company
Represented By: Joseph Philip Rejano
Represented By: Steven G. Carlson
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Leonard Shuftan
Represented By: Amartya Bagchi
Represented By: Gregory H. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Wheeler Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Meggie Francine Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Scott H. Koontz
Represented By: Jacob D. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise Cascade, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Darling Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Phenolic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company, The
Represented By: Justin A. Borawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Justin A. Borawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nash Engineering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Dely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Represented By: Merideth Snow Daly
Represented By: Charles Matthew Alva
Represented By: Rick C Shea
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hardie-Tynes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The Gorman Rupp Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Columbia Boiler Coimpany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Tate Andale, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Lynn Carlson
Represented By: Louis E. Grenzer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Richard Evan Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: George Lishman
Represented By: Troyce G. Wolf
Represented By: Ethan Flint
Represented By: Dana C. Simon
Represented By: Klint Lee Bruno
Represented By: Michael Loren Silverman
Represented By: Demetrios T Zacharopoulos
Represented By: Harold Harvey Hunter
Represented By: Dana Casselli Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Morse-Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Spirax-Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Gardner Denver Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Claire Cooper Kossmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Amphenol Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BAE Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Ann Simaytis
Represented By: Michael B Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Justin A. Borawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AW Chesterton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Anthony David Danhelka
Represented By: Mark I. Tivin
Represented By: Pamela Rose Gamble
Represented By: Anthony Danhelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Lishman
Represented By: Troyce G. Wolf
Represented By: Ethan Flint
Represented By: Dana C. Simon
Represented By: Klint Lee Bruno
Represented By: Michael Loren Silverman
Represented By: Demetrios T Zacharopoulos
Represented By: Harold Harvey Hunter
Represented By: Lawrence King Holcomb
Represented By: Dana Casselli Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?