Nieto-Roman v. Jackson
Petitioner: Jose Miguel Nieto-Roman
Respondent: Leonta Jackson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01586
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 ELECTRONIC Notice Case transferred from Illinois Northern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS as case 1:21-cv-03096, filed 04/23/2021. (gcy, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (rc, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Court acknowledges receipt of Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition #1 and has conducted its initial review pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases. Petitioner was convicted in Cass County and is currently confined in Livingston County (in the Pontiac Correctional Center). Both counties are situated in the federal judicial district for the Central District of Illinois (see 28 U.S.C. 93(a)(1)), and thus, the Central District of Illinois has jurisdiction over this action. 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241(d) and 1404(a), and on the Court's own motion, it is ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Neither the writ of habeas corpus nor any rule to show cause shall issue in this action unless so directed by the transferee court. Civil case closed. Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 4/7/2021. Mailed notice. (lw, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Jose Miguel Nieto-Roman against Leonta Jackson Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-18047026. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Stephen)
March 23, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieto-Roman v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Miguel Nieto-Roman
Represented By: Stephen L. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?