Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. v. Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C
Plaintiff: GODDESS AND BAKER WACKER L.L.C.
Defendant: STERLING BAY COMPANIES, L.L.C. and Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C
Case Number: 1:2021cv01597
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's unopposed motion to postpone the initial status hearing #21 is granted. The status hearing set for 5/6/21 is stricken and reset to 6/11/21 at 9:00 a.m. The deadline to file an initial status report is reset to 6/3/21. The dial in number remains the same. (ca, )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C - Defendant's Unopposed Motion For To Postpone Initial Status Hearing - (Roselius, Joseph)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C by Jacob Riley Clubb (Clubb, Jacob)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C by Joseph Anton Roselius (Roselius, Joseph)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C by John J. Hamill, Jr (Hamill, John)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, LLC's motion for substitution of counsel #15 and motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #16 are granted. Defendant's answer is due by 5/27/21. Mailed notice (yt)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C for extension of time (Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint) (Martin, Craig)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Attorney Craig C. Martin, Matt D. Basil, Laura L. Norris, and Samuel J. Gamer to withdraw as attorney for Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C. No party information provided (Martin, Craig)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C by Samuel Gamer (Gamer, Samuel)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C by Laura L. Norris (Norris, Laura)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C by Matt D. Basil (Basil, Matt)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C (DEFENDANT STERLING BAY COMPANIES, LLC'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTIFICATION AS TO AFFILIATES) (Martin, Craig)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C by Craig Christopher Martin (Martin, Craig)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. as to Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Zouras, James)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. by Matthew A Galin (Galin, Matthew)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. by Howard William Foster (Foster, Howard)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C (txl, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 5/6/21 at 8:45 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 4/29/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. MAILED notice (gel, )
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. by Anna Ceragioli (Ceragioli, Anna)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zouras, James)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by GODDESS AND BAKER WACKER L.L.C.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18050108.(Zouras, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goddess and Baker Wacker L.L.C. v. Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GODDESS AND BAKER WACKER L.L.C.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Howard William Foster
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: Anna Ceragioli
Represented By: Matthew A Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLING BAY COMPANIES, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Bay Companies, L.L.C
Represented By: John J. Hamill, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Gamer
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Laura L. Norris
Represented By: Jacob Riley Clubb
Represented By: Joseph Anton Roselius
Represented By: Matt D. Basil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?