MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: DV LUXURY RESORT, LLC, PENDRY NORTH AMERICA, LLC, 1715 THAMES STREET, LLC, RGC GASLAMP, LLC, BAHIA SERENA S. DE R.L. DE C.V., NATIRAR RESORT DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MONTAGE NORTH AMERICA, LLC, CABO LHR S. DE R.L. DE C.V. and MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01598
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 4/7/2021 #14 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (jn, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Counsel for Zurich American Insurance Company ("Zurich") has notified the Court that the parties have agreed to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion to remand #10 is granted, and the briefing schedule is stricken as moot. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to remand this case forthwith to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sxw)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' motion to remand #10 is due 4/20/21; Plaintiffs' reply is due 4/27/21. Ruling by mail. The motion hearing set for 4/8/21 at 9:00 a.m. is stricken. Mailed notice (sxw)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Paul R. Walker Bright for presentment of motion to remand, #10 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Walker Bright, Paul)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by 1715 THAMES STREET, LLC, BAHIA SERENA S. DE R.L. DE C.V., CABO LHR S. DE R.L. DE C.V., DV LUXURY RESORT, LLC, MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC, MONTAGE NORTH AMERICA, LLC, NATIRAR RESORT DEVELOPMENT, LLC, PENDRY NORTH AMERICA, LLC, RGC GASLAMP, LLC in support of motion to remand, #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Elbert Declaration)(Walker Bright, Paul)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs 1715 THAMES STREET, LLC, BAHIA SERENA S. DE R.L. DE C.V., CABO LHR S. DE R.L. DE C.V., DV LUXURY RESORT, LLC, MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC, MONTAGE NORTH AMERICA, LLC, NATIRAR RESORT DEVELOPMENT, LLC, PENDRY NORTH AMERICA, LLC, RGC GASLAMP, LLC to remand Plaintiffs' Opposed Section 1447(C) Motion to Remand (Walker Bright, Paul)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION RE TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (Fitzpatrick, Dennis)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court clarifies that the initial status hearing on June 3 will take place at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court orders the parties to file a joint written status report by May 28, 2021, and sets an initial status hearing on June 3, 2021. The joint written status report, which shall be as concise as possible, shall set forth: (1) the current deadlines imposed by the Court and whether the matter has been referred to the Magistrate Judge in any fashion (e,g., for discovery supervision; for resolution of a motion; for settlement; etc.); (2) the progress of discovery, if discovery is ongoing; (3) the status of briefing on unresolved motions, if any; (4) whether the parties have engaged or are engaging in settlement discussions and the status of those discussions; (5) for cases without any future court dates, an agreed proposed schedule; (6) for cases that have future court dates and if the parties believe there is good cause to extend the current deadlines, a proposed amended schedule and the basis for the request; (7) a request for any agreed action that the Court can take without a hearing; (8) and whether the parties believe a telephonic hearing or in-person hearing is necessary within the next 60 days, and, if so, the issue(s) that warrants discussion and the parties' respective positions. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the initial status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 26, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 1715 THAMES STREET, LLC, BAHIA SERENA S. DE R.L. DE C.V., CABO LHR S. DE R.L. DE C.V., DV LUXURY RESORT, LLC, MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC, MONTAGE NORTH AMERICA, LLC, NATIRAR RESORT DEVELOPMENT, LLC, PENDRY NORTH AMERICA, LLC, RGC GASLAMP, LLC by Paul R. Walker Bright (Walker Bright, Paul)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 1715 THAMES STREET, LLC, BAHIA SERENA S. DE R.L. DE C.V., CABO LHR S. DE R.L. DE C.V., DV LUXURY RESORT, LLC, MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC, MONTAGE NORTH AMERICA, LLC, NATIRAR RESORT DEVELOPMENT, LLC, PENDRY NORTH AMERICA, LLC, RGC GASLAMP, LLC by Angela R. Elbert (Elbert, Angela)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company by Mindy Marie Medley (Medley, Mindy)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company by Dennis Devin Fitzpatrick (Fitzpatrick, Dennis)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fitzpatrick, Dennis)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fitzpatrick, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DV LUXURY RESORT, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENDRY NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1715 THAMES STREET, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGC GASLAMP, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAHIA SERENA S. DE R.L. DE C.V.
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIRAR RESORT DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTAGE NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CABO LHR S. DE R.L. DE C.V.
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Walker Bright
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis Devin Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Mindy Marie Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?