Hinton et al v. United States Of America(FTCA) et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Clark and Rasheed Hinton
Defendant: Guadalupe Garcia, United States Of America(FTCA), Chicago Family Health Center, Inc., For Women Only Healthcare, Inc., Sharon A. Wallace-Williams, Aster Loha, Lucy N. Karbeah, Naomi O. Sanni, Marjorie Ginoy Michel, Dara Therese Nuzzo, Lisa de Juana Daniel, Monica Nichele Carter, Advanced Gyne & Cosmetic Care, Marie-Teresa Christophe Colbert, Marsha Angella Rodney, Advocate Health and Hospitals Corporation doing business as Advocate Trinity Hospital doing business as Advocate Medical Group doing business as Advocate Children's Medical Group and Nina Guadalupe Garcia
Case Number: 1:2021cv01681
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aster Loha, Naomi O. Sanni, Sharon A. Wallace-Williams by Anne S. Kuban Loha, Sanni, Wallace-Williams (Kuban, Anne)
May 26, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marjorie Ginoy Michel, Dara Therese Nuzzo by Anne S. Kuban Nuzzo & Michel (Kuban, Anne)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guadalupe Garcia, Lucy N. Karbeah, Marsha Angella Rodney by Anne S. Kuban Garcia, Rodney, Karbeah (Kuban, Anne)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Advocate Health and Hospitals Corporation by Anne S. Kuban Advocate Trinity Hospital (Kuban, Anne)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Advocate Health and Hospitals Corporation by Anne S. Kuban Advocate Medical Group (Kuban, Anne)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status date set for 5/26/2021 and resets it to 2/1/2022 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should file a joint status report by 1/25/2022 indicating the status of fact discovery and settlement discussions. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due by 5/29/2021. The Court sets the following discovery schedule: Rule 26(a) disclosures are due by 7/1/2021; written discovery to issue by 7/30/2021; and fact discovery closes on 7/31/2022. The parties should file any motions for confidentiality orders by 6/18/2021, using the Court's Model Order and providing a clean and redlined copy to the Court's proposed order email. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Crystal Clark, Rasheed Hinton by Andrew Witherington Mason (Mason, Andrew)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Crystal Clark (LaCien, Brian)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Of America(FTCA)(Phillip, Danielle)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #5 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 5/5/2021. The initial status conference is set for 5/26/2021 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 5/19/2021. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Danielle Anne Phillip for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #5 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/6/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Phillip, Danielle)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Crystal Clark, Rasheed Hinton by Brian LaCien (LaCien, Brian)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/30/21.(gcy, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant United States Of America(FTCA) for extension of time to file response/reply (Phillip, Danielle)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Danielle Anne Phillip as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Of America(FTCA) (Phillip, Danielle)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Phillip, Danielle)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019 L 14017) filed by United States Of America(FTCA) Notice of Removal of a Civil Action and Substitution of the United States as Defendant (Phillip, Danielle)
March 29, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinton et al v. United States Of America(FTCA) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Garcia
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America(FTCA)
Represented By: Danielle Anne Phillip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Family Health Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: For Women Only Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon A. Wallace-Williams
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aster Loha
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy N. Karbeah
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi O. Sanni
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie Ginoy Michel
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dara Therese Nuzzo
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa de Juana Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Nichele Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Gyne & Cosmetic Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie-Teresa Christophe Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Angella Rodney
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Health and Hospitals Corporation doing business as Advocate Trinity Hospital doing business as Advocate Medical Group doing business as Advocate Children's Medical Group
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Guadalupe Garcia
Represented By: Anne S. Kuban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Clark
Represented By: Andrew Witherington Mason
Represented By: Brian LaCien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheed Hinton
Represented By: Andrew Witherington Mason
Represented By: Brian LaCien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?