Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd. v. Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund et al
Plaintiff: Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.
Defendant: Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2021cv01763
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois's agreed motion for extension of time #8 is granted. Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois's responsive pleading due on or before 07/02/2021. The joint initial status report due on 06/15/2021 is extended to 07/09/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Agreed) (Ives, Kirstin)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois by Kirstin Beth Ives (Ives, Kirstin)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.. Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 5/31/2021. (McLaughlin, Kenneth)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 5/31/2021. (McLaughlin, Kenneth)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 6/15/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 joint status report) (axc).
April 1, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McLaughlin, Kenneth)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McLaughlin, Kenneth)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18080726. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(McLaughlin, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd. v. Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Stephen McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois
Represented By: Kirstin Beth Ives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?