Guaranteed Rate, Inc. v. Holzmeister Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Defendant: Pristine Media Group, LLC, Holzmeister Group, LLC, Graham Gochneaur and Patrick Scott Holz-Meister
Case Number: 1:2021cv01814
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: A notice of voluntary dismissal (Dkt. #25 ) has been filed. This case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, against Defendants Patrick Scott Holz-Meister, Holzmeister Group, LLC, Pristine Media Group LLC, and Graham Gochneaur. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Niewoehner, Rachel)
June 17, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The court has reviewed Plaintiff's status report. Plaintiff has reached agreements in principle with all defendants to resolve all claims asserted in this matter on confidential terms. In light of the settlement, the court vacates default entered against defendants Patrick Scott Holz-Meister and Holzmeister Group, LLC. entered on 5/12/21 #21 . On or before 7/15/21, parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss or status report on settlement. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 23 STATUS Report by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Niewoehner, Rachel)
May 18, 2021 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Pristine Media Group, LLC (Nwabuoku, Onyinyechukwu)
May 12, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion for default #20 is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 55(a) the court enters default against defendants Patrick Scott Holz-Meister and Holzmeister Group, LLC. The Court will vacate this order if defendant Patrick Scott Holz-Meister and Holzmeister Group, LLC file a responsive pleading by 6/4/21. Plaintiff is directed to mail a copy of this order to Patrick Scott Holz-Meister and Holzmeister Group, LLC at the address where they were served in Charleston by 5/14/21. Plaintiff should include an update in the joint status report due on 6/17/21 regarding any contacts counsel has had with defendant Patrick Scott Holz-Meister or Holzmeister Group, LLC. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Guaranteed Rate, Inc. for entry of default against Defendants Patrick Scott Holz-Meister and Holzmeister Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jason M. Fitterer)(Niewoehner, Rachel)
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Pristine Media Group, LLC's agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #17 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 6/11/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pristine Media Group, LLC by Onyinyechukwu Koplan Nwabuoku (Nwabuoku, Onyinyechukwu)
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Pristine Media Group, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Felton, Thadford)
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 JURY Demand (Felton, Thadford)
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pristine Media Group, LLC by Thadford A. Felton (Felton, Thadford)
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Guaranteed Rate, Inc. regarding Summons served on Pristine Media Group, LLC on 04/13/2021 (Niewoehner, Rachel)
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Guaranteed Rate, Inc. regarding Summons served on Holzmeister Group LLC on 04/13/2021 (Niewoehner, Rachel)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Guaranteed Rate, Inc. regarding Summons served on Patrick Scott Holz-Meister on 04/13/2021 (Niewoehner, Rachel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by William C. Lawrence #10 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18131258. (Lawrence, William)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 6/17/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 8, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Graham Gochneaur, Patrick Scott Holz-Meister, Holzmeister Group, LLC, Pristine Media Group, LLC (dxb, )
April 7, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Niewoehner, Rachel)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Niewoehner, Rachel)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Jason Fitterer (Fitterer, Jason)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Holly A. Harrison (Harrison, Holly)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Rachel B. Niewoehner (Niewoehner, Rachel)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Niewoehner, Rachel)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18090699. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Niewoehner, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guaranteed Rate, Inc. v. Holzmeister Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pristine Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Thadford A. Felton
Represented By: Onyinyechukwu Koplan Nwabuoku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holzmeister Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Gochneaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Scott Holz-Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel B. Niewoehner
Represented By: Holly A. Harrison
Represented By: Jason Fitterer
Represented By: William Clayton Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?