Jones v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Judith Jones
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02000
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Jason Frank's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #22 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18258774. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Frank, Jason)
May 18, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice filed by Scott H. Sims #20 . Mailed notice (gel, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18243617. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sims, Scott)
May 13, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion for extension of time to file joint status report is granted and any joint status report shall be filed on or before 7/2/2021. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by PNC Bank, N.A. (Panoff, Thomas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. by Lucy Lee Holifield (Holifield, Lucy)
May 12, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. by Christopher Steven Comstock (Comstock, Christopher)
May 12, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. by Megan Sandra Webster (Webster, Megan)
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. by Thomas Vangel Panoff (Panoff, Thomas)
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Judith Jones. PNC Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (McNulty, Shannon)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judith Jones by Alexander F Beale (Beale, Alexander)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judith Jones by Brian Hanlin (Hanlin, Brian)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judith Jones by Franklin D Azar (Azar, Franklin)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judith Jones by Michael D. Murphy (Murphy, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Franklin Azar, Brian Hanlin and Alexander Beale's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 , #5 and #6 are granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 5/14/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18140098. (Beale, Alexander)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18140061. (Hanlin, Brian)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18140018. (Azar, Franklin)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judith Jones by Shannon Marie McNulty (McNulty, Shannon)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judith Jones by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Judith Jones; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18125047. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clifford, Robert)
April 14, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Jones
Represented By: Shannon Marie McNulty
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: Franklin D Azar
Represented By: Michael D. Murphy
Represented By: Brian Hanlin
Represented By: Alexander F Beale
Represented By: Jason Marshall Frank
Represented By: Scott Howard Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lucy Lee Holifield
Represented By: Megan Sandra Webster
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Christopher Steven Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?