Ramos v. ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Leving Siegel and Joselyn Ramos
Defendant: ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02032
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. Plaintiff's Combined Motions for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena #46 are granted. It is so ordered. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/16/2023. Mailed notice(vcf, )
March 16, 2023 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Joint motion to extend discovery deadlines until 4/27/2023 #49 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for class certification is due by 5/1/2023. Telephonic status hearing set for 3/23/2023 is reset to 5/9/2023 at 10:20 a.m. The parties shall use the same call-in information #29 . Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 15, 2023 Filing 52 REPLY by Movant Jessica Leving Siegel, Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos to motion for protective order,, motion to quash, #46 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Excerpts from the Deposition of Joselyn Ramos)(Ovca, Michael)
March 15, 2023 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply #50 is granted. Plaintiff is instructed to file the proposed reply as a separate document. Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 15, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION by Movant Jessica Leving Siegel, Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos for leave to file Reply In Support of Combined Motions to For Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply In Support of Combined Motions to For Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Reply In Support of Combined Motions to For Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena)(Ovca, Michael)
March 13, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION by Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos for extension of time to complete discovery Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Ovca, Michael)
March 7, 2023 Filing 48 RESPONSE by ZoomInfo Technologies, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos, Movant Jessica Leving Siegel for protective order to bar response to subpoenaMOTION by Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos, Movant Jessica Leving Siegel to quash subpoena #46 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Roth, Martin)
February 21, 2023 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for protective order and to quash subpoena #46 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 3/7/2023. Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 14, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION by Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos, Movant Jessica Leving Siegel for protective order to bar response to subpoena, MOTION by Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos, Movant Jessica Leving Siegel to quash subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Declaration of Michael Ovca)(Ovca, Michael)
January 25, 2023 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Joint motion to extend discovery deadline until 3/13/2023 #44 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for class certification is due by 3/16/2023. Telephonic status hearing set for 2/2/2023 is reset to 3/23/2023 at 10:10 a.m. The parties shall use the same call-in information #29 . Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 23, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos for extension of time Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Ovca, Michael)
December 29, 2022 Filing 43 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
October 14, 2022 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for leave to withdraw Benjamin S. Thomassen's appearance as one of the counsel of record for plaintiff #41 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 11, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION by Attorney Benjamin S. Thomassen to withdraw as attorney for Joselyn Ramos. No party information provided (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 13, 2022 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Joint motion to extend discovery deadline until 1/27/2023 #39 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 9/27/2022 is reset to 2/2/2023 at 9:50 a.m. The parties shall use the same call-in information #29 . Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 9, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos for extension of time - Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Ovca, Michael)
September 8, 2022 Filing 38 AGREED Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/8/2022. Joint agreed motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order #37 is granted. Mailed notice(vcf, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC for protective order Joint Agreed Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Martin)
June 3, 2022 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Joint motion to extend fact discovery deadline until 9/26/2022 #35 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 8/30/2022 is reset to 9/27/2022 at 9:50 a.m. The parties shall use the same call-in information #29 . Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC for extension of time Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Roth, Martin)
January 24, 2022 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: In light of the Proposed Case Management Schedule filed on 11/10/2021 #31 , telephonic status hearing set for 1/25/2022 is reset to 8/30/2022 at 9:40 a.m. Fact discovery ordered closed by 8/26/2022. The parties shall use the same call-in information #29 . Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos by Schuyler Ufkes (Ufkes, Schuyler)
December 13, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos by Michael W Ovca (Ovca, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 31 Proposed Case Management Schedule by Joselyn Ramos (Thomassen, Benjamin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos by Philip L. Fraietta (Fraietta, Philip)
October 26, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing held and continued to 1/25/2022 at 10:20 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 28 Defendant's ANSWER to amended complaint by ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC(Roth, Martin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos by Albert J. Plawinski (Plawinski, Albert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joselyn Ramos by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 First AMENDED complaint by Joselyn Ramos against ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC and terminating Jessica Leving Siegel (individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Thomassen, Benjamin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Written Consent to Amend by Jessica Leving Siegel (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Leving Siegel by Philip Fraietta (Fraietta, Philip)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: ZoomInfo's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #13 ] is denied. Status is set for 10/26/2021 at 10:40 a.m. It is so ordered. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/22/2021. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Mailed notice(vcf, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 20 Stipulated Request to Substitute Putative Class Representative by Jessica Leving Siegel (Thomassen, Benjamin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY by Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC to Response #18 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 , memorandum in support of motion #14 (Roth, Martin)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jessica Leving Siegel to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 , memorandum in support of motion #14 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing held. Briefing schedule previously set stands. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint #13 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 7/2/2021; Reply is due by 7/16/2021. Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Constitutional Question pursuant to FRCP 5.1(a) by ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC (Roth, Martin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Roth, Martin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC (Roth, Martin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification as to Affiliates of ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC (Roth, Martin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead on or before 6/10/2021 #10 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 6/15/2021 at 10:10 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 [Agreed Motion] (Roth, Martin)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC by William Edward Arnault, Iv (Arnault, William)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC by Rachel B. Haig (Haig, Rachel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC by Martin L. Roth (Roth, Martin)
April 16, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC (crl, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Leving Siegel by Albert J. Plawinski (Plawinski, Albert)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Leving Siegel by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Leving Siegel by Benjamin Scott Thomassen (Thomassen, Benjamin)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Leving Siegal by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Richman, Benjamin)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jessica Leving Siegal; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18129046.(Richman, Benjamin)
April 15, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZoomInfo Technologies, LLC
Represented By: William Edward Arnault, Iv
Represented By: Rachel B. Haig
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Leving Siegel
Represented By: Albert J. Plawinski
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Philip Fraietta
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joselyn Ramos
Represented By: Albert J. Plawinski
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Michael W Ovca
Represented By: Philip L. Fraietta
Represented By: Schuyler Ufkes
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?