Griffin-Thomas v. La Rabida Children's Hospital
Plaintiff: Kia Griffin-Thomas
Defendant: La Rabida Children's Hospital
Case Number: 1:2021cv02033
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: In light of the briefing schedule entered on 6/3/2021 #13 , the telephone status hearing set for 6/15/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff to file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss #10 by 7/1/2021. Defendant to file a reply by 7/15/2021. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Defendant's motion to extend time to file answer to complaint until after the ruling on the motion to dismiss is granted. No appearance is necessary on 6/4/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Jenny R. Goltz for presentment of motion to dismiss, extension of time #10 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/4/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Goltz, Jenny)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by La Rabida Children's Hospital in support of motion to dismiss, extension of time #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goltz, Jenny)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant La Rabida Children's Hospital to dismiss (Partial Rule 12(b)(6), MOTION by Defendant La Rabida Children's Hospital for extension of time to Answer Complaint (Goltz, Jenny)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 6/1/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant La Rabida Children's Hospital for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Goltz, Jenny)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant La Rabida Children's Hospital by Jenny R. Goltz (Goltz, Jenny)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kia Griffin-Thomas as to La Rabida Children's Hospital on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Herrera, Julie)
April 19, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant La Rabida Children's Hospital (cm, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 6/15/2021 at 10:30 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kia Griffin-Thomas by Steven James Molitor, Jr (Molitor, Steven)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kia Griffin-Thomas by Julie Herrera (Herrera, Julie)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herrera, Julie)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kia Griffin-Thomas; jury demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18129125.(Herrera, Julie)
April 15, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin-Thomas v. La Rabida Children's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Rabida Children's Hospital
Represented By: Jenny R. Goltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kia Griffin-Thomas
Represented By: Steven James Molitor, Jr
Represented By: Julie Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?