Northwestern Memorial Healthcare v. Aetna Better Health of Illinois,
Plaintiff: Northwestern Memorial Healthcare
Defendant: Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., a CVS Health Company, fka Illinicare Health Plan, Inc., Does 1 through 25, Inclusive, Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc.,, Does 1 through 25 and Illinicare Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02054
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., (McCoy, Benjamin)
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc.'s opposed motion to dismiss #13 as follows: Plaintiff's response due on or before 06/14/2021; Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc.'s reply due on or before 06/28/2021. The Court will rule on Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc.'s opposed motion to dismiss #13 via CM/ECF. Mailed notice (axc).
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 (McCoy, Benjamin)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Declaration K. Dixon, #2 Exhibit A through L)(McCoy, Benjamin)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., by Benjamin H McCoy (McCoy, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The parties' joint consent motion to extend the deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint #10 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading due on or before 5/21/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., for extension of time to file Second Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Dougherty, Colin)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northwestern Memorial Healthcare by Marcus Rockwell Morrow (Morrow, Marcus)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 4/20/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The parties' stipulation, consent motion, and [proposed] order extending the deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint [ 5] is granted. Enter order. Defendants' responsive pleading due on or before 5/6/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., by Marc Craig Smith APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF ILLINOIS, INC., BY MARC C. SMITH (Smith, Marc)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., for extension of time to file Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Dougherty, Colin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 6/29/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d), the removing party's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. The removing party should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the opposing party has been given notice of removal. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 joint status report) (axc).
April 19, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., a CVS Health Company, fka Illinicare Health Plan, Inc. by Colin D. Dougherty (Dougherty, Colin)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dougherty, Colin)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021L002066) filed by Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., a CVS Health Company, fka Illinicare Health Plan, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18133030. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C-Declaration, #4 Exhibit D-Notice to State Court)(Dougherty, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwestern Memorial Healthcare v. Aetna Better Health of Illinois,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwestern Memorial Healthcare
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc., a CVS Health Company, fka Illinicare Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Better Health of Illinois, Inc.,
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Represented By: Benjamin H McCoy
Represented By: Marc Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinicare Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Represented By: Benjamin H McCoy
Represented By: Marc Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?