Zeyadeh v. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Zeyadeh
Defendant: John Doe II, Cook County, Illinois, Thomas J. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County and John Doe I
Case Number: 1:2021cv02129
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 7/9/2021 and the parties' initial joint status report is due by 7/12/2021. The Court strikes the status date set for 6/22/2021 and resets it to 7/15/2021 at 1:30 p.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Defendants Thomas J. Dart and County of Cook's NOTICE of Motion by Emily Liv Stewart for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/15/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Stewart, Emily)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas J. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County for extension of time to their motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint (Stewart, Emily)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas J. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County by Emily Liv Stewart (Stewart, Emily)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Zeyadeh as to Cook County, Illinois on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (Casper, Cass)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Zeyadeh as to Thomas J. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Casper, Cass)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Zeyadeh by Richard F. Linden (Linden, Richard)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Zeyadeh by Peter Vincent Bustamante (Bustamante, Peter)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference is set for 6/22/2021 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 6/15/2021. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas J. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County (cm, )
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Zeyadeh by Gianna Rochelle Scatchell (Scatchell, Gianna)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Zeyadeh by Navarrio Douglas Wilkerson (Wilkerson, Navarrio)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to County of Cook, Illinois c/o Cook County Clerk on April 20, 2021 by Plaintiff Nicholas Zeyadeh. Waiver of service due by 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Casper, Cass)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Thomas J. Dart on April 20, 2021 by Plaintiff Nicholas Zeyadeh. Waiver of service due by 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Casper, Cass)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Zeyadeh by Cass Thomas Casper (Casper, Cass)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas Zeyadeh; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18147672. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casper, Cass)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeyadeh v. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Zeyadeh
Represented By: Gianna Rochelle Scatchell
Represented By: Navarrio Douglas Wilkerson
Represented By: Cass Thomas Casper
Represented By: Peter Vincent Bustamante
Represented By: Richard F. Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Represented By: Emily Liv Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Dart, Sheriff of Cook County
Represented By: Emily Liv Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?