Endencia v. American Psychiatric Association et al
Plaintiff: Frances Endencia
Defendant: Laua Siedleski, Dr. Stafford Henry, Gil Martinez, Sr., The Knox Company, Dr. John Coyne, Bartlett Fire/Police Department, Steve Kisch, Dan Maloney, PMH Partners, Dan Benyousky, James Keegan, Lisa Fabiano, Wendy Vaughn, Dr. Joel Price, Sr., Nathan Hamacek, Mandarino, American Psychiatric Association, ADT Security System, Dr. Joel Price, Jr., Alexian Brothers Behavioral Health and Wheaton Youth Outreach
Case Number: 1:2021cv02360
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Nathan Hamacek. (cp, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's response to Defendant Wheaton Youth Outreach's motion to dismiss and motion for sanctions #19 is due 7/26/21. Defendant's reply is due 8/16/21. The court will rule by mail. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 21 Corrected Exhibits D, G and H to Motion to Dismiss (Dkt 20) by Wheaton Youth Outreach (Poland, Christian)
June 25, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Wheaton Youth Outreach in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #19 and Motion for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit s B through H)(Poland, Christian)
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wheaton Youth Outreach AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Poland, Christian)
June 6, 2021 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS by Frances Endencia to MOTION by Defendant American Psychiatric Association to dismiss and for sanctions #8 , memorandum in support of motion, #9 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Petition to Add IDFPR, #2 Certificate of Service Summons Service)(Endencia, Frances)
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motions to dismiss #8 , #15 is due 6/25/21; Defendants' reply due 7/9/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland Defendant Wheaton Youth Outreach's motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #13 is granted. Defendant's response is due 6/25/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 28, 2021 MAILED a copy of minute entry dated 5/28/21 to Plaintiff. (dm, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant ADT Security System to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Kopon, Colette)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADT Security System by Colette Lynn Kopon (Kopon, Colette)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Wheaton Youth Outreach for extension of time to file response/reply as to complaint #6 (Poland, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wheaton Youth Outreach Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates (Poland, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wheaton Youth Outreach by Christian Mark Poland (Poland, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Psychiatric Association (Skoczylas, Christine)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by American Psychiatric Association in support of motion to dismiss #8 and for sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nonprofit Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - IDFPR News, #3 Exhibit 3 - Disciplinary Record, #4 Exhibit 4 - Memorandum and Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dismissal Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Appellate Order)(Skoczylas, Christine)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant American Psychiatric Association to dismiss and for sanctions (Skoczylas, Christine)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Psychiatric Association by Christine Elizabeth Skoczylas (Skoczylas, Christine)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction regarding #1 . (aee, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Frances Endencia and 8 copies (Exhibits). (aee, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to DCFS of Glenn Elyn, Bill Maffy; Zeke Legal Clinic of NIU;Wheaton Youth Outreach (Dan Benyousky); Hamacek, Nathan; Knox Boc Company; PMH Partners c/o John Coyne; American Psychiatric Association; ADT Security System; Lisa Fabiano, Judge (exr, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (exr, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Frances Endencia and 8 copies (Exhibits) (exr, ) Modified on 5/4/2021 (exr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endencia v. American Psychiatric Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laua Siedleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Stafford Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil Martinez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Knox Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Coyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartlett Fire/Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMH Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Benyousky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Fabiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joel Price, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Hamacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Psychiatric Association
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Skoczylas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT Security System
Represented By: Colette Lynn Kopon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joel Price, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexian Brothers Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheaton Youth Outreach
Represented By: Christian Mark Poland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Endencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?