Melinta Therapeutics, LLC et al v. Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Melinta Therapeutics, LLC
Defendant: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02636
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18440661. (Chou, Monica)
June 28, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY by Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #18 for 45-Day Extension to Local Patent Rule 2.1 Initial Disclosures (Hood, Gary)
June 25, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file document under seal #19 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 21 REDACTED ANSWER to counterclaim OF DEFENDANT NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. by Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Anderson, Brian)
June 22, 2021 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO THE COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Anderson, Brian)
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiffs Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file UNDER SEAL (Anderson, Brian)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time for Exchange of Initial Disclosures under Local Patent Rule 2.1 #14 (Wallace, Joel)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: By agreement of the parties, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion For 45-Day Extension To Local Patent Rule 2.1 Initial Disclosures #14 : Defendant must respond on or before 6/21/2021 and Plaintiffs must reply on or before 6/28/2021. Within one week of filing, each side must provide two paper courtesy copies of their respective briefs to chambers via U.S. Mail or reliable commercial delivery service. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR 45-DAY EXTENSION TO LOCAL PATENT RULE 2.1 INITIAL DISCLOSURES STATEMENT by Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hood, Gary)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Imron T Aly (Aly, Imron)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiffs Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time for Exchange of Initial Disclosures under Local Patent Rule 2.1 (Hood, Gary)
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Brian Neil Anderson (Anderson, Brian)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Defendant's Motion to for leave to file under seal document #11 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Counter Claimant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to seal document sealed document #9 (Wallace, Joel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 REDACTED ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. against All Plaintiffs . by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Wallace, Joel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (Wallace, Joel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joel M Wallace (Wallace, Joel)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (exr, )
May 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Claims Involving Patents under Local Rule 3.4 by Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hood, Gary)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Mark Thomas Deming (Deming, Mark)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Hood, Gary)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Gary Edward Hood (Hood, Gary)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hood, Gary)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Melinta Subsidiary Corp.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18250241. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hood, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melinta Therapeutics, LLC et al v. Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinta Subsidiary Corp.
Represented By: Gary Edward Hood
Represented By: Mark Thomas Deming
Represented By: Brian Neil Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Edward Hood
Represented By: Mark Thomas Deming
Represented By: Brian Neil Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinta Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Gary Edward Hood
Represented By: Mark Thomas Deming
Represented By: Brian Neil Anderson
Represented By: Monica Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Imron T Aly
Represented By: Joel M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?