Kyle Rayome v ABT Electronics Inc.
Plaintiff: Kyle Rayome
Defendant: ABT Electronics Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02639
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 STATUS Report by Kyle Rayome (Madden, John)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kyle Rayome by Katherine Dee Ellis (Ellis, Katherine)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kyle Rayome by Margaret Megan O'Malley (O'Malley, Margaret)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Kyle Rayome re waiver of service executed #6 (Ellis, Katherine)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kyle Rayome. ABT Electronics Inc. waiver sent on 5/28/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Ellis, Katherine)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ABT Electronics Inc. by Jennifer Anne Naber (Naber, Jennifer)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 7/2/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kyle Rayome by John Paul Madden (Madden, John)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Madden, John)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kyle Rayome; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18250642.(Madden, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle Rayome v ABT Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Rayome
Represented By: John Paul Madden
Represented By: Katherine Dee Ellis
Represented By: Margaret Megan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABT Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Naber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?