Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Lynk Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Defendant: Lynk Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02665
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/13/2021: Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc.'s motion for leave to file under seal #46 is granted. (rbf, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Oral argument set for 7/13/2021 at 02:00 p.m. is stricken and reset for 07/23/2021 at 11:00 a.m. and will be conducted via video-conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 the meeting number/access code is 180 659 3247. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (rbf, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to seal document reply, #45 (Shimota, James)
July 12, 2021 Filing 45 SEALED REPLY by Lynk Labs, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue #24 Defendant's Reply in Support (Unredacted) (Shimota, James)
July 12, 2021 Filing 44 REPLY by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to motion to dismiss #22 Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Public/Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nelson Hua, #2 Ex. A to Hua Declaration, #3 Ex. B to Hua Declaration, #4 Ex. C to Hua Declaration, #5 Ex. D to Hua Declaration)(Shimota, James)
July 12, 2021 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:The parties' request for an oral argument on defendant, Lynk Labs' motion to strike certain allegations to dismiss counts IV and IX for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and to transfer venue #22 is granted. Oral argument is set for 7/13/2021 at 02:00 p.m. and will be conducted via video-conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 the meeting number/access code is 180 659 3247. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed by judge's staff. (rbf, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal #41 is granted. Notices mailed by judge's staff. (rbf, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION by Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to seal document sealed response, #39 , sealed document,, #40 - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, Dismiss and Transfer; Declaration of Xin-Yi Zhou; Exhibits 3-6 Zhou Declaration (Yagura, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. - Declaration of Xin-Yi Zhou In Support of Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Lynk Lab's Motion to Strike, Dismiss and Transfer (Unredacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted), #2 Exhibit 4 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit 5 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 6 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted))(Yagura, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 39 SEALED RESPONSE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to response in opposition to motion,,,,, #38 Samsung's Opposition to Lynk Labs, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Unredacted) (Yagura, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Public/Redacted) #22 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Juliet Consignado, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Xin-Yi Zhou (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1 Zhou Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 Zhou Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 Zhou Declaration (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 Zhou Declaration (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 Zhou Declaration (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 Zhou Declaration (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 7 Zhou Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 Zhou Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 Zhou Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 Zhou Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 Zhou Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 Zhou Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 Zhou Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 Zhou Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 Zhou Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 Zhou Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 Zhou Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 Zhou Declaration, #21 Exhibit 19 Zhou Declaration, #22 Exhibit 20 Zhou Declaration, #23 Exhibit 21 Zhou Declaration, #24 Exhibit 22 Zhou Declaration, #25 Exhibit 23 Zhou Declaration, #26 Exhibit 24 Zhou Declaration, #27 Exhibit 25 Zhou Declaration)(Yagura, Ryan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Marc J. Pensabene (Pensabene, Marc)
June 24, 2021 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Xin-Yi Zhou (Zhou, Xin-Yi)
June 24, 2021 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Nicholas J. Whilt (Whilt, Nicholas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Laura Bayne Gore (Gore, Laura)
June 24, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by D. Sean Trainor (Trainor, D.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Darin W Snyder (Snyder, Darin)
June 24, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Ryan Ken Yagura (Yagura, Ryan)
June 24, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:Plaintiff's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #29 is granted. Attorney Marc J. Pensabene is given leave to file his appearance on behalf of plaintiff. Notices mailed by judge's staff. (rbf, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18384315. on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Pensabene, Marc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss to strike certain allegations, to dismiss counts IV and IX for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and to transfer venue #22 , #24 as follows: Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 6/30/2021 and defendant's reply in support shall be filed by 7/13/2021. Notices mailed by judicial staff. (rbf, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File under Seal Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/10/2021.(rbf, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to seal document sealed document, #25 , SEALED MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue #24 (Shimota, James)
June 9, 2021 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Unredacted) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mike Miskin, #2 Declaration of Nelson Hua, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nelson Hua)(Shimota, James)
June 9, 2021 Filing 24 SEALED MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Shimota, James)
June 9, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Lynk Labs, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Public/Redacted Version) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mike Miskin (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Nelson Hua (Redacted), #3 Exhibit A to Hua Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit B to Hua Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Hua Declaration)(Shimota, James)
June 9, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Public/Redacted) (Shimota, James)
June 9, 2021 Filing 21 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 21 CV 2665, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Lynk Labs, Inc. pending before the Hon. Jorge L. Alonso, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating; therefore It is hereby ordered that 21 CV 2665, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al. v. Lynk Labs, Inc., is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/9/2021. (lma, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18288797. (Hua, Nelson)
May 25, 2021 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. against Lynk Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Yagura, Ryan)
May 20, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18272105. on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Snyder, Darin)
May 19, 2021 Filing 17 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Ronald A. Guzman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/19/2021. (lma, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. as to Lynk Labs, Inc. on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (Abdelnour, Dennis)
May 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18265631. (Trainor, D.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Laura Bayne Gore's motion to appear pro hac vice #13 on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. is granted.Mailed notice. (kp, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18265135. (Gore, Laura)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. by James A Shimota (Shimota, James)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorneys' Xin-Yi Zhou, Nicholas J. Whilt and Ryan Ken Yagura motion to appear pro hac vice #8 , #9 , #10 on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18261413. (Yagura, Ryan)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18261398. (Whilt, Nicholas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18261384. (Zhou, Xin-Yi)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (gw, )
May 18, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. (cm, )
May 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Claims Involving a Patent by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Abdelnour, Dennis)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Abdelnour, Dennis)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Ron N. Sklar (Sklar, Ron)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Dennis John Abdelnour (Abdelnour, Dennis)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Abdelnour, Dennis)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18255812. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Abdelnour, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Lynk Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynk Labs, Inc.
Represented By: James A Shimota
Represented By: Nelson Hua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Dennis John Abdelnour
Represented By: Ron N. Sklar
Represented By: Darin W Snyder
Represented By: Marc J. Pensabene
Represented By: Ryan Ken Yagura
Represented By: D. Sean Trainor
Represented By: Laura Bayne Gore
Represented By: Nicholas J. Whilt
Represented By: Xin-Yi Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis John Abdelnour
Represented By: Ron N. Sklar
Represented By: Darin W Snyder
Represented By: Marc J. Pensabene
Represented By: Ryan Ken Yagura
Represented By: D. Sean Trainor
Represented By: Laura Bayne Gore
Represented By: Nicholas J. Whilt
Represented By: Xin-Yi Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?