Lindsey v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Anthony Lindsey
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Case Number: 1:2021cv03156
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted over Plaintiff's objection. The City shall answer or otherwise plead by 8/20/21. The deadline of 8/25/21 for parties to file a joint initial status report #5 is re-set to 9/10/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Honorow, Rena)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Rena M. Honorow (Honorow, Rena)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Susan Margaret O'Keefe (O'Keefe, Susan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 8/25/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 15, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City Of Chicago (jg, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anthony Lindsey by Ronald C. Dahms (Dahms, Ronald)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anthony Lindsey by Paul D. Geiger (Geiger, Paul)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Geiger, Paul)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Lindsey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18345030.(Geiger, Paul)
June 11, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Rena M. Honorow
Represented By: Susan Margaret O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lindsey
Represented By: Ronald C. Dahms
Represented By: Paul D. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?