Kainz et al v. Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Buczkowski, Heather Kainz, Sabrina Fox and Sara Bailey
Defendant: Sokol John, Leonta Jackson, Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Renzi Kelly, Kennedy Teri, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Emily Ruskin and Jeffreys Rob
Case Number: 1:2021cv03239
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Wexford Health Sources Inc waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Renzi Kelly waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Jeffreys Rob waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by John M Carmody (Carmody, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Karen Munoz (Munoz, Karen)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Martin A. Dolan (Dolan, Martin)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motions by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 #6 #7 are granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18380128. (Thomson, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18376064. (Stamler, Patricia)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18375986. (Turchyn, Matthew)
June 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos (Bolanos, Maria)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Robin B. Potter (Potter, Robin)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Potter, Robin)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18361925.(Potter, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kainz et al v. Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sokol John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzi Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Teri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffreys Rob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Buczkowski
Represented By: Robin B. Potter
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A. Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Kainz
Represented By: Robin B. Potter
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A. Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Fox
Represented By: Robin B. Potter
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A. Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Bailey
Represented By: Robin B. Potter
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A. Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?