Andrea Vestrand v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Vestrand
Defendant: Macys, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That, Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire and Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03372
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 29 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (ph, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 28 RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-04360 (ph)
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 Conditional Transfer Order - 2 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2967, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Illinois and assigned to Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand, upon Defendant Thomas Mulcaire served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lee Wolosky, Floyd Abrams, Howard Suskin, Joel Kurtzberg, Andrew Lichtman; counsel for defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand, upon Defendant Hoan Ton-That served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lee Wolosky, Floyd Abrams, Howard Suskin, Joel Kurtzberg, Andrew Lichtman; counsel for defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand, upon Defendant Richard Schwartz served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lee Wolosky, Floyd Abrams, Howard Suskin, Joel Kurtzberg, Andrew Lichtman; counsel for defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand, upon Defendant Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lee Wolosky, Floyd Abrams, Howard Suskin, Joel Kurtzberg, Andrew Lichtman; counsel for defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand, upon Defendant Macys, Inc. served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Saeedi, counsel for Defandant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand, upon Defendant Clearview AI, Inc. served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lee Wolosky, Floyd Abrams, Howard Suskin, Joel Kurtzberg, Andrew Lichtman; counsel for defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hoan Ton-That. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Richard Schwartz. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Thomas Mulcaire. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Macys, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Clearview AI, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. correcting Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #6 (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 **WITHDRAWN** Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Drury, Scott) Modified on 5/28/2021 Per Notice #8 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 **WITHDRAWN** Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Drury, Scott) Modified on 5/28/2021 Per Notice #8 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand, (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31356606 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Vestrand. (Attorney Megan Pierce added to party Andrea Vestrand(pty:pla))(Pierce, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrea Vestrand v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Ton-That
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mulcaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Vestrand
Represented By: Megan Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?