Hurvitz v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Hurvitz
Defendant: Macys, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That, Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire and Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03373
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 25 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record (bg, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 24 RECEIVED from New York Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02960 (bg)
June 23, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFIED COPY of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-2: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of December 15, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 22 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-2: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of December 15, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hurvitz. Macys, Inc. served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hurvitz. Hoan Ton-That served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hurvitz. Richard Schwartz served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hurvitz. Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hurvitz. Thomas Mulcaire served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hurvitz. Clearview AI, Inc. served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Hoan Ton-That. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Richard Schwartz. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Thomas Mulcaire. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Macys, Inc.. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Clearview AI, Inc.. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Drury on behalf of Aaron Hurvitz (notification declined or already on case) (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Scott Drury is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/2/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14530978. by Aaron Hurvitz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott Drury, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Aaron Hurvitz (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Macy's Inc., #2 Proposed Summons Thomas Mulcaire, #3 Proposed Summons Rocky Mountain Data Analytics, #4 Proposed Summons Richard Schwartz, #5 Proposed Summons Hoan Ton-That) (Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on August 27, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By August 20, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/27/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Aaron Hurvitz (Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clearview AI, Inc., Macys, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14508733 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Aaron Hurvitz. (Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurvitz v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Ton-That
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mulcaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hurvitz
Represented By: Scott Drury
Represented By: Karen Anne Newirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?