Dow v. Saul
Plaintiff: Matrice S. Dow
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv03512
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Susan E Cox
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Motion for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #10 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 10/29/2021 and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Pursuant to Local Rule 8.1(b), the Social Security Administration's filing of the certified administrative record, in and of itself, shall suffice as the agency's answer to the complaint. Plaintiff's opening brief is due on or before 1/10/2022. Defendant's response brief is due on or before 2/24/2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on or before 3/10/2022. Mailed notice (np, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Raedy, Valerie)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 8/30/2021 and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Pursuant to Local Rule 8.1(b), the Social Security Administration's filing of the certified administrative record, in and of itself, shall suffice as the agency's answer to the complaint. Plaintiff's opening brief is due on or before 10/29/2021. Defendant's response brief is due on or before 12/17/2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on or before 1/7/2022. Mailed notice (np, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Susan E. Cox for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 73.1. Parties have consented to the reassignment. Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/9/21.(gcy, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Valerie Rebecca Raedy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Raedy, Valerie)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The parties should promptly consult with each other on the following topics: 1) Agree to file consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge; 2) Do the parties agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner? 3) If not, motions for summary judgment shall be briefed as follows: motion for summary judgment shall be filed within 60 days of the filing of the answer and administrative record. Response is due 45 days thereafter. Reply, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Matrice S. Dow for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matrice S. Dow by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matrice S. Dow; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
June 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dow v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Valerie Rebecca Raedy
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matrice S. Dow
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?