Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: City of Chicago and Metropolitan Water Reclamation Dist Of Greager Chicago
Case Number: 1:2021cv03537
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The Court has reviewed parties' briefs on Plaintiff's motion to remand #14 and requires an additional, albeit short, brief. On or before 8/31/21, Defendants shall file a sur-reply of no more than 8 double spaced pages. The Court will rule by mail. In addition, Defendants need not answer or respond to the amended complaint pending the Court's resolution of Plaintiff's motion to remand. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Johnson, Steven)
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED complaint by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Steven)
August 9, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Steven R. Johnson Amended Appearance (Johnson, Steven)
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic status hearing held. Counsel appeared telephonically. Plaintiff's combined motion to amend the initial complaint under rule 15 and to remand to state court #14 is granted in part. The court will allow plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 8/9/21. Plaintiff also permitted to file reply regarding request to remand. The court will determine whether it has jurisdiction under the removal standard. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic status set for 8/6/21 at 9:00AM. Parties shall call 866-434-5269 and the access code is 3751971. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE by City of Chicago to MOTION by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America to amend/correct Initial Complaint under Rule 15MOTION by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America to remand To State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1447(c) #14 (Rosen, Jordan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Bart Zimmer (Zimmer, Bart)
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America to amend/correct Initial Complaint under Rule 15, MOTION by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America to remand To State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1447(c) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement)(Johnson, Steven)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Steven R. Johnson (Johnson, Steven)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' agreed motions for extension of time #10 and #11 are granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 8/10/21. On or before 8/31/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation Dist Of Greager Chicago for extension of time (Morakalis, Susan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time (Rosen, Jordan)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal to counsel of record. (rc, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation Dist Of Greager Chicago by Jorge Tom Mihalopoulos (Mihalopoulos, Jorge)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation Dist Of Greager Chicago by Anastasios T. Foukas (Foukas, Anastasios)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation Dist Of Greager Chicago by J. Mark Powell (Powell, J.)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation Dist Of Greager Chicago by Susan T. Morakalis (Morakalis, Susan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rosen, Jordan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Jordan Alexander Rosen (Rosen, Jordan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, County Department, Law, case number (2021L004971) filed by City of Chicago (Rosen, Jordan)
July 6, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Jordan Alexander Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Water Reclamation Dist Of Greager Chicago
Represented By: Anastasios T. Foukas
Represented By: J. Mark Powell
Represented By: Jorge Tom Mihalopoulos
Represented By: Susan T. Morakalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Steven R. Johnson
Represented By: Bart Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?