Pietrucha v. Saul
Plaintiff: Amy L. Pietrucha
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv03557
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certificated Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint #6 . Defendant shall file the Electronic Certificated Administrative Record and its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by 11/01/2021. The parties shall file their joint status report, pursuant to #5 , by 11/01/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Phillip, Danielle)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record (no motion required). The Social Security Administration's motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support are due 45 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Additionally, on or before the deadline for the filing of the administrative record, the parties shall file a joint status report in which they indicate (i) whether the parties will agree to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and (ii) whether they will agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge, they shall execute and file with the court the joint consent form, which may be found at the following location: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_online/consent.pdf. If the parties agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner, they must file an agreed motion for remand. Mailed notice (axc).
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Danielle Anne Phillip as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Phillip, Danielle)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amy L. Pietrucha by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amy L. Pietrucha; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18417608. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
July 2, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pietrucha v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy L. Pietrucha
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Danielle Anne Phillip
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?