Glab v. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, US LLC
Plaintiff: Wojciech (Adam) Glab
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, US LLC and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03638
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing set for 9/2/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 9/30/2021. Joint Status Report shall be due by 10/7/2021. Initial Status hearing is reset for 10/12/2021 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice. (lk, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Michael Cady for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/2/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Cady, Stephen)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant FCA US LLC for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Cady, Stephen) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/30/2021 (ph, ).
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FCA US LLC by Stephen Michael Cady (Cady, Stephen) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/30/2021 (ph, ).
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FCA US LLC by Timothy V. Hoffman (Hoffman, Timothy) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/30/2021 (ph, ).
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wojciech (Adam) Glab as to FCA US LLC on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Tomei, Robert)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wojciech (Adam) Glab as to Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, US LLC on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Tomei, Robert)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/10/2021) (ec, ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED complaint by Wojciech (Adam) Glab against FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lubin, Peter)
August 9, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Plaintiff FCA US LLC (jmk, )
July 26, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, US LLC (jmk, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 9/27/2021 at 9:00 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wojciech (Adam) Glab by Robert J Tomei, Jr (Tomei, Robert)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wojciech (Adam) Glab by Patrick Doyle Austermuehle (Austermuehle, Patrick)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wojciech (Adam) Glab by Terrence Buehler (Buehler, Terrence)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wojciech (Adam) Glab by Peter Scott Lubin (Lubin, Peter)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lubin, Peter)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wojciech (Adam) Glab; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18438771.(Lubin, Peter)
July 9, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glab v. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wojciech (Adam) Glab
Represented By: Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Represented By: Peter Scott Lubin
Represented By: Robert J Tomei, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Timothy V. Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Michael Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?