Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund and Charles A. Whobrey
Defendant: Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc., Wingra Stone Company and Sundby Sand and Gravel Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03684
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to extend time to Respond to Defendants' Counterclaim #16 is granted. Answer shall be due by 9/14/2021. Joint Status Report is now due by 9/23/2021. Initial Status hearing is reset for 9/29/2021 at 9:00 AM which will proceed via Teleconference. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Motion hearing set for 8/18/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice. (lk, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony E. Napoli for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #16 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/18/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Napoli, Anthony)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Counter Defendants Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey, Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey for extension of time to file answer to Counterclaim - Unopposed (Napoli, Anthony)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , Defendants' COUNTERCLAIM filed by Wingra Stone Company, Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc., Sundby Sand and Gravel Co., Inc. against All Plaintiffs . by Wingra Stone Company, Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc., Sundby Sand and Gravel Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Van Hook, Abigail)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sundby Sand and Gravel Co., Inc., Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc., Wingra Stone Company by Abigail Rachel Van Hook (Van Hook, Abigail)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 9/15/2021 at 9:15 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to Wingra Stone Company on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Napoli, Anthony)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc. on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Napoli, Anthony)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to Sundby Sand and Gravel Co., Inc. on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Napoli, Anthony)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Anthony E. Napoli (Napoli, Anthony)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Brandon Andrew Buyers (Buyers, Brandon)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Brad R. Berliner (Berliner, Brad)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Albert M. Madden (Madden, Albert)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Matthew B Wesley (Wesley, Matthew)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wesley, Matthew)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT Filing Fee $402, receipt number 0752-1845523 filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey; (Wesley, Matthew)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Correction regarding #1 (ec, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Entered in Error. Modified on 7/12/2021 (ec, ).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Sundby Sand and Gravel Co., Inc., Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc., Wingra Stone Company (exr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Matthew B Wesley
Represented By: Albert M. Madden
Represented By: Anthony E. Napoli
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Brandon Andrew Buyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Whobrey
Represented By: Matthew B Wesley
Represented By: Albert M. Madden
Represented By: Anthony E. Napoli
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Brandon Andrew Buyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingra Redi-Mix, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Rachel Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingra Stone Company
Represented By: Abigail Rachel Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundby Sand and Gravel Co., Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Rachel Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?