Davis et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dwight Davis, Howard Stanley and Stanley Howard
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Does 1-20, John Does 1-20 and Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03798
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to amended complaint by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC(Mcconnell, Jeremy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 STATUS Report (Initial Status Report) by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Mcconnell, Jeremy)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC by Jeremy Kyle Mcconnell (Mcconnell, Jeremy)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 Verified AMENDED complaint by Dwight Davis, Howard Stanley against All Defendants (Dudley, Kelli)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Unopposed Motion to extend deadline to file responsive pleading and written consent to file Amended Complaint #9 is granted. Amended Complaint shall be filed by 8/13/2021. Answer shall be filed by 8/27/2021. Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2021. Teleconference Initial Status hearing is reset for 9/15/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC for extension of time (Unopposed - Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading and Written Consent to File Amended Complaint) (Gregg, Arthur)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dwight Davis, Howard Stanley by Kelli A Dudley (Dudley, Kelli)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC by Arthur David Gregg (Gregg, Arthur)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Motion for extension of time to answer #5 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 8/6/2021. Initial status hearing set for 8/18/2021 at 9:00 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Hayde, Thomas)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jn, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC by Thomas W Hayde (Hayde, Thomas)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hayde, Thomas)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Illinois Circuit Court, case number (2021CH02792) filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18465194. (Docket Sheet, Summons and Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal to State Court, #3 Exhibit C)(Hayde, Thomas)
July 16, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Davis
Represented By: Kelli A Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Howard
Represented By: Kelli A Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas W Hayde
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Represented By: Jeremy Kyle Mcconnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?