Ochoa v. Material Service Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mariana M Ochoa
Defendant: Material Service Corporation d/b/a Hanson Material Service Corporation, Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Heidelberg Cement Group, Captain Kenneth L Stubbs, Kenneth L Stubbs, Celio San Gabriel, Hanson Aggregates Midwest, Inc. f/k/a Material Service Corporation d/b/a Hanson Material Service Corporation and Lehigh Hanson, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03936
Filed: July 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Hanson Aggregates Midwest, Inc. f/k/a Material Service Corporation d/b/a Hanson Material Service Corporation, Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Lehigh Hanson, Inc., Kenneth L Stubbsin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Mariana M Ochoa to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiff Mariana M Ochoa to remand the matter to state court #13 #17 , MOTION by Plaintiff Mariana M Ochoa to remand the matter to state court #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Carol Lowry Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - 2006 News Article)(Settergren, Neal)
September 10, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Kenneth L Stubbs, Hanson Aggregates Midwest, Inc. f/k/a Material Service Corporation d/b/a Hanson Material Service Corporation, Lehigh Hanson, Inc. against Celio San Gabriel . by Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Kenneth L Stubbs, Hanson Aggregates Midwest, Inc. f/k/a Material Service Corporation d/b/a Hanson Material Service Corporation, Lehigh Hanson, Inc.(Settergren, Neal)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Material Service Corporation of Order and Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Approving Letter of Undertaking, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits)(Curtis, Jacob)
September 3, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Mariana M Ochoa to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiff Mariana M Ochoa to remand the matter to state court #13 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Gallagher, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 16 Second AMENDED complaint by Mariana M Ochoa against Heidelberg Cement Group, Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Material Service Corporation, Kenneth L Stubbs, Celio San Gabriel (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Gallagher, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #11 . The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion to remand #13 : Defendants' responses are due by 9/27/2021 and Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/12/2021. The Court strikes the initial status hearing for 9/23/2021 and resets it to 12/14/2021 at 9:30 AM for ruling on Plaintiff's motion to remand. The parties should submit the initial joint status report by 12/7/2021. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Michael L. Gallagher for presentment of motion to remand #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/31/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Gallagher, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Mariana M Ochoa to remand the matter to state court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint)(Gallagher, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Michael L. Gallagher for presentment of motion for leave to file, #11 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/31/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Gallagher, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Mariana M Ochoa for leave to file to File Second Amended Complaint at Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Gallagher, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Material Service Corporation (Settergren, Neal)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Material Service Corporation, Kenneth L Stubbs(Settergren, Neal)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/4/2021: Mailed notice(gw, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18524908. (Settergren, Neal)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Motion by Jacob Curtis for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 9/23/2021 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/16/2021. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/28/2021. Mailed notice (lma, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18496755. (Curtis, Jacob)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rc, )
July 26, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
July 24, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Heidelberg Cement Group, Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Material Service Corporation, Kenneth L Stubbs by Paul W. Carroll (Carroll, Paul)
July 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carroll, Paul)
July 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021L006726) filed by Heidelberg Cement Group, Lehigh Hanson Services LLC, Material Service Corporation, Kenneth L Stubbs Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18494197. (Carroll, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa v. Material Service Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana M Ochoa
Represented By: Michael L. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Material Service Corporation d/b/a Hanson Material Service Corporation
Represented By: Paul W. Carroll
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Hanson Services LLC
Represented By: Paul W. Carroll
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidelberg Cement Group
Represented By: Paul W. Carroll
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kenneth L Stubbs
Represented By: Paul W. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L Stubbs
Represented By: Paul W. Carroll
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celio San Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Aggregates Midwest, Inc. f/k/a Material Service Corporation d/b/a Hanson Material Service Corporation
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Hanson, Inc.
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?