Evans et al v. 210 East Pearson Condominium Association et al
Plaintiff: Linda Evans and Emily Evans
Defendant: 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Robert Harles, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC, Richard Holtzman and Rob Harles
Case Number: 1:2021cv03941
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Linda Evans (Cruz, Kevin)
September 16, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs to file a response to defendants' motion to dismiss #27 by 10/14/2021. Defendants to file a reply by 10/28/2021. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Status and presentment hearing set for 9/24/2021 are stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #27 (Ryan, James)
September 16, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by James H. Ryan for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #27 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/24/2021 at 10:45 AM. (Ryan, James)
September 16, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC (Ryan, James)
August 23, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' motion to substitute counsel #14 is granted. Attorneys Michael Charles Kim and Adam C. Maxwell terminated. No appearance necessary on 8/24/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Richard Holtzman by Marissa Louise Dellacroce (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dellacroce, Marissa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC by Marissa Louise Dellacroce (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dellacroce, Marissa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rob Harles by Marissa Louise Dellacroce (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dellacroce, Marissa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association by Marissa Louise Dellacroce (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dellacroce, Marissa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 210 East Pearson Condominium Association by Marissa Louise Dellacroce (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dellacroce, Marissa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Richard Holtzman by James H. Ryan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC by James H. Ryan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rob Harles by James H. Ryan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association by James H. Ryan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC by James H. Ryan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by James H. Ryan for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #14 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/24/2021 at 10:45 AM. (Ryan, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC to substitute attorney (Ryan, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiffs' complaint #10 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 9/16/2021. No appearance necessary on 8/24/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Adam C. Maxwell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #10 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/24/2021 at 10:45 AM. (Maxwell, Adam)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC by Michael Charles Kim (Kim, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Maxwell, Adam)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman, Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC by Adam C. Maxwell (Maxwell, Adam)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Evans as to Rob Harles on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Cruz, Kevin)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Evans as to Richard Holtzman on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021; Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Cruz, Kevin)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Evans as to 210 East Pearson Condominium Association on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Cruz, Kevin)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Evans as to Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Cruz, Kevin)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 9/24/2021 at 9:15 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 27, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association, Rob Harles, Richard Holtzman. (lxk, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Emily Evans, Linda Evans by Kevin Carmichael Cruz kcruz@oflaherty-law.com (Cruz, Kevin)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cruz, Kevin)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Linda Evans, Emily Evans; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18494751. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through C)(Cruz, Kevin)
July 26, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. 210 East Pearson Condominium Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Evans
Represented By: Kevin Carmichael Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Evans
Represented By: Kevin Carmichael Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 210 East Pearson Condominium Association
Represented By: Adam C. Maxwell
Represented By: James H. Ryan
Represented By: Michael Charles Kim
Represented By: Marissa Louise Dellacroce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Managers of 210 East Pearson Condominium Association
Represented By: Adam C. Maxwell
Represented By: Marissa Louise Dellacroce
Represented By: Michael Charles Kim
Represented By: James H. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Harles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Shores Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Adam C. Maxwell
Represented By: Marissa Louise Dellacroce
Represented By: Michael Charles Kim
Represented By: James H. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Holtzman
Represented By: Adam C. Maxwell
Represented By: Marissa Louise Dellacroce
Represented By: Michael Charles Kim
Represented By: James H. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Harles
Represented By: Adam C. Maxwell
Represented By: Marissa Louise Dellacroce
Represented By: Michael Charles Kim
Represented By: James H. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?