Steelcase Inc. et al v. Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Petitioner: Steelcase Inc and SC Transport Inc.
Respondent: Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Counter Claimant: Charles A Whobrey
Case Number: 1:2021cv03984
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report #32 . Court approves of the Case Management Plan: The parties file their respective Motions to Appoint an Arbitrator (along with their supporting briefs) on or before October 22, 2021. The parties file responses to the other party's Motion on or before November 22, 2021. Agreed Written Status Report is due on 12/9/2021. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 32 STATUS Report (Joint, Agreed) by Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey (Yu, Lois)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: This Court appointed Judge James Holderman as arbitrator in this case on September 2, 2021 and terminated the action. However, the Court has received correspondence from Judge Holderman in which he requests that the Court relieve him from appointment as arbitrator due to his current mediation commitment schedule. The Court grants Judge Holderman's request, and accordingly vacates the judgment entered by the Court on September 2, 2021 #29 #30 . The parties shall submit an agreed written status report on or before September 20, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 9/10/2021: Mailed notice. (rc, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 30 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (rc, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the joint status report submitted by the parties on August 30, 2021. Petitioners request that the Court appoint an arbitrator from the list they offer, dkt. 1 at 13, and Respondent requests that the Court appoint an arbitrator from the list it offers, dkt. 9 at 31. The Court appoints James R. Holderman, former Chief Judge of the Northern District of Illinois, as arbitrator in the parties' pending arbitration. The clerk is ordered to enter judgment for Petitioners. Civil case terminated. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 9/2/2021: Mailed notice. (rc, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 28 STATUS Report (Joint) by SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc (Edsenga, Patrick)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: This case was recently transferred to this Court from the Western District of Michigan. Parties shall file a joint written status report promptly, no later than August 30, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/6/2021. Mailed notice (nsf, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioners SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc, Counter Defendants SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc by Patrick Michael Edsenga (Edsenga, Patrick)
July 29, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimants Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey, Respondent Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Andrew James Herink (Herink, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimants Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey, Respondent Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Brad R. Berliner (Berliner, Brad)
July 29, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimants Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey, Respondent Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Kevin Matthew Kleine (Kleine, Kevin)
July 29, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimants Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey, Respondent Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Lois J. Yu (Yu, Lois)
July 28, 2021 Filing 21 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 20 RECEIVED from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00864 (bg)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #7 motion to transfer case to Northern District of Illinois ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to response to motion #7 with certificate of compliance and certificate of service filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (jem). Modified text on 1/4/2021; filed per Order #17 (jem). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 motion for leave to file reply brief; the Clerk of Court shall accept the proposed document for filing; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file reply brief (opposed) #14 filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file reply brief (opposed) #14 filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to file reply brief (opposed) by respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief) (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim, #9 by SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc. (Eastland, Keith) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (jem). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to transfer case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division #7 filed by SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eastland, Keith) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to transfer case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division #7 filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding Motion to Transfer Case #7 and certificate of concurrence; motion held in abeyance pending filing of certificate; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint #1 by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund and, COUNTERCLAIM against SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc. by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey (Yu, Lois) Modified text on 11/17/2020 (eod). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION to transfer case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division #7 filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit) (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to transfer case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division by respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund; (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
November 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lois J. Yu on behalf of counter-claimants Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lois J. Yu on behalf of respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (Yu, Lois) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steelcase Inc., SC Transport Inc. as to Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 (Edsenga, Patrick) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steelcase Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Fifth Third Bancorp for Steelcase Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) Modified text on 9/10/2020 (ems). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SC Transport Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Steelcase Inc. for SC Transport Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 9, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $353.00, receipt number KZ004185; for remainder of civil filing fee (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 9, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Michael Edsenga on behalf of petitioners SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 8, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $47.00 by attorney Keith E. Eastland on behalf of petitioner, receipt number AMIWDC-5664253; for filing fee (mkc) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mkc). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 8, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (filing fee not paid) (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 8, 2020 (DISREGARD) (Eastland, Keith) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (ems). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Appoint Arbitrator) against Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund filed by Steelcase Inc., SC Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Eastland, Keith) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (ems). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 7/28/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steelcase Inc. et al v. Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steelcase Inc
Represented By: Patrick Michael Edsenga
Represented By: Keith E. Eastland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SC Transport Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Michael Edsenga
Represented By: Keith E. Eastland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Central States Southeast And Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Lois J. Yu
Represented By: Andrew James Herink
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Kleine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Charles A Whobrey
Represented By: Lois J. Yu
Represented By: Andrew James Herink
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Kleine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?