Hamzic v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Fata Hamzic
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04161
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cummings
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cummings. The administrative record shall be filed by 10/15/21. The Court will set a briefing schedule after the record has been filed. Mailed notice (ma,)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING : Case reassigned to the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 73.1. Parties have consented to the reassignment. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/16/21.(gcy, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Kelly, Kathryn)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Fata Hamzic; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(daj, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff's brief shall be filed 60 days after the Administrative Record is filed on the court's docket. Defendant SSA's response shall be filed 45 days after the plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed 14 days thereafter. The court will issue a ruling via CM/ECF. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 5, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Fata Hamzic for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fata Hamzic by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fata Hamzic; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamzic v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fata Hamzic
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?