Marol State, L.L.C. v. Everlane, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marol State, L.L.C.
Defendant: Everlane, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04286
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 STATUS Report (Joint) by Marol State, L.L.C. (Walsh, Christine)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Everlane, Inc. by Robert Radasevich (Radasevich, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Everlane, Inc. by William John Tarnow (Tarnow, William)
September 19, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 10/6/2021, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 10/13/2021 at 9:40 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to extend the sealing of this case is denied #7 . Plaintiff has not offered a legitimate basis to keep the case or any documents associated with it (including the parties' lease) out of the public record. The Court acknowledges that the parties' lease contains a confidentiality provision. But it is an ordinary commercial lease and there is no appropriate basis consistent with the First Amendment right of access to court proceedings to keep the case or the lease under seal. The Clerk is directed to unseal the file in this case. Mailed notice. (mma, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Marol State, L.L.C. Motion to Extend Seal (Yardley, Thomas) Modified on 8/20/2021 (mma, ).
August 17, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Everlane, Inc. (jmk, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18559603. (Yardley, Thomas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marol State, L.L.C. by Thomas P. Yardley (Yardley, Thomas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marol State, L.L.C. by Christine Rhae Walsh (Walsh, Christine)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Walsh, Christine)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Marol State, L.L.C. Complaint for Breach of Contract and Other Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Lease, #2 Exhibit 2- Invoice, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit 4- Surrender Letter, #5 Exhibit 5- Notice of Termination)(Walsh, Christine) Modified on 8/20/2021 (mma, ).
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Marol State, L.L.C. Written Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to LR 5.7 (Walsh, Christine) Modified on 8/20/2021 (mma, ).
August 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marol State, L.L.C. v. Everlane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marol State, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas P. Yardley
Represented By: Christine Rhae Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everlane, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Radasevich
Represented By: William John Tarnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?