Ross v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Christine Ross
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04384
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Weisman. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Parties shall follow the briefing schedule set forth in Local Rule 16.4. Mailed notice (ao, )
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable M. David Weisman, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings. Honorable John Robert Blakey no longer assigned to the case, parties having consented to the reassignment. Signed by Honorable John Robert Blakey on 08/24/2021. (rc, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction regarding Create Related Case. (rc, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Alex Harms Hartzler as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Hartzler, Alex)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christine Ross for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Ross by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christine Ross; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
August 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ross
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Alex Harms Hartzler
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?