Steven Schneider v. Bayer Healthcare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Schneider
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2021cv04478
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 36 RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-02771 (nsf,)
August 31, 2021 Filing 37 MAILED MDL Transfer in letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 35 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3009, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Illinois and assigned to Honorable Honorable John R. Blakey. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Stipulation is GRANTED. This case is stayed, pending resolution of theMDL petition currently pending before the JPML, and the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby stricken. In the event the JPML declines to transfer or consolidate this action, any response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint shall be filed within 30 days of the JPML decision. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Motion for Transfer Before the JPML filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Sexton, #2 Proposed Order)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE HIS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ESTABLISHING DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation #26 : The following current deadlines are vacated and the following revised deadlines shall apply: Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint with this stipulation and the First Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed as of that day; Defendants shall have until June 24, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint; Plaintiff shall thereafter have thirty (30) days to oppose any motion made by Defendants under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12; Defendants shall thereafter have fourteen (14) days to file any reply to Plaintiffs opposition papers. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Tarek Ismail to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC and Elanco Animal Health Inc., designating Naoki S. Kaneko as local counsel #18 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel E. Schoenburg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC and Elanco Animal Health Inc., designating Naoki S. Kaneko as local counsel #17 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Rami N. Fakhouri to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC and Elanco Animal Health Inc., designating Naoki S. Kaneko as local counsel #16 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Laura A. Sexton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC and Elanco Animal Health Inc., designating Naoki S. Kaneko as local counsel #15 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition, #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The title of the document should state FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION to AMEND Stipulation to Amend/Correct #21 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Declaration N. Kaneko in Support of Amended Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Nelson, John) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, DOES, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Steven Schneider (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nelson, John) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE HIS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ESTABLISHING CERTAIN DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS #21 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint with this stipulation and the First Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed as of that day. Defendants' motion to dismiss is currently due on May 7, 2021. Defendants shall thereafter have fourteen (14) days to file any reply. (See document for further details) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-02506 VAP(KSx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-02771 VAP(KSx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Plaintiff Steven Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, John) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 Re Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on April 2, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - COS of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 Re Notice to Clerk of Removal to Federal Court served on April 2, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - COS of Notice to Clerk of Removal to Federal Court)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tarek Ismail to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31037376) filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Tarek Ismail, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Ernest Schoenburg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31037302) filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Samuel Schoenburg, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rami Naji Fakhouri to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31037224) filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Rami Fakhouri, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura A. Sexton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31037060) filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Laura Sexton, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Samuel E. Schoenburg. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laura Sexton. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rami N. Fakhouri. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tarek Ismail. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 filed by Defendant Elanco Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Steven Schneider in San Luis Obispo Superior Court on 3/2/2021, attached as Exhibit A1. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elanco Animal Health, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, identifying Bayer AG. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Luis Obispo, case number 21CV-0115 with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 03/31/2021, receipt number ACACDC-31018749), filed by Defendant Elanco Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit A-4 - Notice of Assignment, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Proof of Service) (Attorney Naoki S Kaneko added to party Bayer Healthcare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Naoki S Kaneko added to party Elanco Animal Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaneko, Naoki) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Schneider v. Bayer Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Schneider
Represented By: Jeffrey R Krinsk
Represented By: John J Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Laura A Sexton
Represented By: Rami N Fakhouri
Represented By: Samuel E. Schoenburg
Represented By: Tarek Ismail
Represented By: Naoki S Kaneko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elanco Animal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Laura A Sexton
Represented By: Rami N Fakhouri
Represented By: Samuel E. Schoenburg
Represented By: Tarek Ismail
Represented By: Naoki S Kaneko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?