Bartosiake v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wayne Bartosiake
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04495
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wayne Bartosiake. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Sheehan, Spencer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 11/8/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 25, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. (ng, )
August 24, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wayne Bartosiake by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wayne Bartosiake; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18594237.(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartosiake v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Bartosiake
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?