Curtis v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Talecia E-Ebonye Curtis
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04580
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Referring Judge: Sheila M Finnegan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kelly, Kathryn)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record (no motion required). The Social Security Administration's motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support are due 45 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice (sxw)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. This action (1) is neither frivolous nor malicious; (2) states a claim on which relief may be granted; and (3) seeks damages against a defendant who is not immune from such relief. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii). See also Manning v. Arizona, No. 12 C 1019, 2012 WL 1161506, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 9, 2012). In addition, the facts set forth in Plaintiff's affidavit demonstrate that Plaintiff has met the burden of establishing indigence. Mailed notice (sxw)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/7/2021. (bg, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction regarding #7 . (aee, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Entered in Error. (aee, ) Modified on 9/3/2021 (aee, ).
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Kelly, Kathryn)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Talecia E-Ebonye Curtis for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Talecia E-Ebonye Curtis by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Talecia E-Ebonye Curtis; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
August 27, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talecia E-Ebonye Curtis
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?