The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04583
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 21 First AMENDED complaint by The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation against The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation (Attachments: #1 Errata Attachment of Redlined version of am compl per standing order)(Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 1, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss. (Dckt. No. #18 ) Plaintiff's response is due by October 29, 2021. Defendant's reply is due by November 12, 2021. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by BNSF Railway Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mariotti, Renato)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Mariotti, Renato)
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by December 6, 2021. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #15 ) is granted. Attorney Benjamin J. Horwich is added as counsel for BNSF Railway Company. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18696539. (Horwich, Benjamin)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #13 ) is granted. Attorney Rebecca Leigh Sciarrino is added as counsel for BNSF Railway Company. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18694197. (Sciarrino, Rebecca)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable John Robert Blakey no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/20/2021.(jh, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time #8 ; Defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading by 9/30/21. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation by Michael Aaron Albert (Albert, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation by Timothy Andrew Martin Woerner (Woerner, Timothy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant BNSF Railway Company for extension of time to file responsive pleading (Unopposed) (Mariotti, Renato)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 10/11/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNSF Railway Company by Holly Hannah Campbell (Campbell, Holly)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BNSF Railway Company (Mariotti, Renato)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNSF Railway Company by Renato T. Mariotti (Mariotti, Renato)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mariotti, Renato)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois, case number (2021CH03397) filed by BNSF Railway Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18610923. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Mariotti, Renato)
August 27, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Cicero, an Illinois municipal corporation
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: Michael Aaron Albert
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Martin Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Represented By: Renato T. Mariotti
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Sciarrino
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Horwich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?