Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd. et al v. Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd. and Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi
Defendant: Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04718
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to for leave to appear pro hac vice #24 is granted. The motion to withdraw as attorney #27 is granted. Attorney Amber Justina Carpenter is terminated as counsel of record. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The court will set a claim construction schedule after the parties have made more progress on discovery and the exchange of infringement contentions. It is likely that the court will not conduct claim construction until the parties finalize their contentions (as contemplated by the Local Patent Rules), but if plaintiff makes a showing that claim construction should occur sooner, the court will entertain the possibility. As an initial schedule, the court adopts the parties' proposal as follows (and notes that the parties have elected to wait until 2022 to start): Defendant's response to the complaint is due 1/4/2022; Initial Disclosures due and fact discovery commences on 2/1/2022; Initial Infringement Contentions due 2/15/2022; Initial Non-Infringement, Unenforceability, and Invalidity Contentions due 3/1/2022; Initial Response to Invalidity Contentions due 3/15/2022; Final Infringement, Unenforceability, and Invalidity Contentions due 7/12/2022; Final Non-Infringement, Enforceability, and Validity Contentions due 8/9/2022; Final Date to Seek Stay Pending Reexamination/IPR is 8/9/2022. All fact discovery shall be noticed in time for completion by 8/9/22. The court will set claim construction and expert discovery schedules when the parties make more progress on fact discovery and contention exchanges. Any requests to amend the pleadings must be made by 05/18/22. An agreed proposed confidentiality order may be submitted to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties may email susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties shall file a status report on discovery progress on 4/6/22. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION by Attorney Amber J. Carpenter to withdraw as attorney for Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi. No party information provided (Hwang, Sharon)
October 18, 2021 Filing 26 STATUS Report JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd. (Parrish, Daniel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd. by Harold V. Johnson (Johnson, Harold)
October 7, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18748815. (Hu, Fei)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/27/2021: Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order, asset restraint, and expedited discovery #9 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] The parties shall confer on a case schedule and file a joint initial status report on 10/18/21. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY by Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi to response in opposition to motion,, #19 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi for temporary restraining order , including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery (Ex Parte) #9 (Lillian, Mao)
September 16, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file excess pages #20 is granted. Plaintiffs' reply brief due 9/17/21 may be up to 20 pages. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd. for leave to file excess pages DEFENDANT SHENZHEN JISU TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING PAGES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - counsel emails)(Parrish, Daniel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi for temporary restraining order , including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery (Ex Parte) #9 DEFENDANT SHENZHEN JISU TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.'S RESPONSE BRIEF OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, INCLUDING A TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, A TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 0-8)(Parrish, Daniel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Telephone motion hearing held. Defendant's written response to the motion for temporary restraining order #9 is due by 9/15/21. Plaintiff's reply is due by 9/17/21. The court will enter a ruling by cm/ecf and set any other deadlines after ruling on the motion. Mailed notice (ags)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 #13 #16 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18652400. (Vander Schaaf, Lyle)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd. by Daniel Alexander Parrish (Parrish, Daniel)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi by Yufeng Ma (Ma, Yufeng)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18644870. (Lillian, Mao)
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18644705. (Martinelli, Richard)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Telephone hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order #9 is set for 9/10/21 at 11:00 a.m. Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing 1-888-204-5984 and using access code 9146677. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the telephone hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #9 and appendices 1-2 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Xiaoxin Huang and Exhibits A-H, #2 Declaration of Lillian J. Mao and Exhibits I-Q)(Hwang, Sharon)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiffs Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi for temporary restraining order , including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery (Ex Parte) (Hwang, Sharon)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (exr, )
September 7, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi (Hwang, Sharon)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi (Hwang, Sharon)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi by Amber Justina Carpenter (Carpenter, Amber)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi by Deborah Ann Laughton (Laughton, Deborah)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi by Sharon Ann Hwang (Hwang, Sharon)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hwang, Sharon)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd., Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18635316. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hwang, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd. et al v. Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzhen Lanhe Technologies Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Amber Justina Carpenter
Represented By: Deborah Ann Laughton
Represented By: Sharon Ann Hwang
Represented By: Mao Jennifer Lillian
Represented By: Richard F. Martinelli
Represented By: Yufeng Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzhenshi LechuangTiancheng Keji Youxiangonsi
Represented By: Amber Justina Carpenter
Represented By: Deborah Ann Laughton
Represented By: Sharon Ann Hwang
Represented By: Richard F. Martinelli
Represented By: Mao Jennifer Lillian
Represented By: Yufeng Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Jisu Technologies Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Fei Hu
Represented By: Lyle Brent Vander Schaaf
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Parrish
Represented By: Harold V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?