Clarke et al v. The Kraft Heinz Company
Plaintiff: Aaron Clarke and Michelle deVera
Defendant: The Kraft Heinz Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04811
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 33 MAILED RULE 83.15 Letter to to all counsel of record. (gcy, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 32 RECEIVED from California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-02437 (gcy)
September 9, 2021 Transferring case electronically to the Northern District of Illinois. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/2021. (rslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #29 to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/16/2021 is continued to 10/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/3/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by The Kraft Heinz Company. (Smith, Alexander) (Filed on 9/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION TO TRANSFER [#17] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON AUGUST 26, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Transfer Venue ) filed byThe Kraft Heinz Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander M. Smith, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Panos, Dean) (Filed on 7/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Transfer Venue ) filed byAaron Clarke, Michelle deVera. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #17 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing previously set for 8/12/2021 is continued to 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against The Kraft Heinz Company. Filed by Aaron Clarke, Michelle deVera. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/9/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Administrative Motion to Stay Deadline to File Responsive Pleading) (Smith, Alexander) (Filed on 7/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #21 TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE CERTAIN DEADLINES. Amended Complaint due by 7/9/2021. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Briefing Schedule and Continue Certain Deadlines filed by The Kraft Heinz Company. (Smith, Alexander) (Filed on 6/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for July 8, 2021 is continued to September 16, 2021 at 10:00 am. All parties shall attend by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. Joint Case Management Statement due by September 9, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 Administrative Motion to Stay Deadline to File Responsive Pleading ) filed byAaron Clarke, Michelle deVera. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 6/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 Administrative Motion to Stay Deadline to File Responsive Pleading filed by The Kraft Heinz Company. Responses due by 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Alexander M. Smith In Support of Administrative Motion to Stay Deadline To File Responsive Pleading, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion To Stay Defendant's Deadline To File Responsive Pleading)(Panos, Dean) (Filed on 6/22/2021) Modified on 6/23/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by The Kraft Heinz Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/6/2021. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander M. Smith in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (Panos, Dean) (Filed on 6/22/2021) Modified on 6/23/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 6/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 6/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dean N. Panos. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Michael Smith on behalf of The Kraft Heinz Company (Smith, Alexander) (Filed on 5/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Dean Panos ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15923347.) filed by The Kraft Heinz Company. (Panos, Dean) (Filed on 5/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Tainsky Spelman (Spelman, Kate) (Filed on 5/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aaron Clarke, Michelle deVera. Service waived by The Kraft Heinz Company waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 5/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Judge The Clerk on 4/13/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Clarke, Michelle deVera.. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Kraft Heinz Company. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 4/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against The Kraft Heinz Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-15795744). Filed by Aaron Clarke, Michelle deVera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 4/5/2021) Modified on 4/6/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke et al v. The Kraft Heinz Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Clarke
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle deVera
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kraft Heinz Company
Represented By: Kate Tainsky Spelman
Represented By: Alexander Michael Smith
Represented By: Dean Nicholas Panos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?