Adam Travel Services, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Adam Travel Services, Inc.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 1:2021cv05216
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Adam Travel Services, Inc. by Jeiel Noh Appearance for Togai Atac (Noh, Jeiel)
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 11/9/2021. Defendant's motion to dismiss #8 is terminated as moot. Defendant has until 12/10/2021 to respond to the amended complaint. A telephonic status hearing is set for 12/20/2021 at 9:05 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Adam Travel Services, Inc. Reformatted PDF - Exhibits regarding amended complaint #14 (Noh, Jeiel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED complaint by Adam Travel Services, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Noh, Jeiel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 10/15/2021. Plaintiff has until 10/29/2021 to file an amended complaint. A telephonic status hearing is set for 11/9/2021 at 8:50 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, conference code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Alexandra Rose to appear pro hac vice #11 is granted. (mk)
October 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18755774. (Rose, Alexandra)
October 9, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint #8 . The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 10/15/2021 at 9:35 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Plaintiff should be prepared to advise the Court whether it wishes to amend the complaint or respond to the motion to dismiss and to set a schedule for either. (mk)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Wells Fargo Bank NA in support of motion to dismiss #8 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Collins, Joseph)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA to dismiss Complaint (Collins, Joseph)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA by Amy S. Rubin (Rubin, Amy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA by Joseph Edward Collins (Collins, Joseph)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Adam Travel Services, Inc. by Jeiel Noh (Noh, Jeiel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Gabrielle Winslow (Winslow, Gabrielle)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MAILED notice of removal letter to all counsel of record. (ph, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from CIRCUIT COURT OF COOK COUNTY, CHANCERY DIVISION, case number (2021CH04236) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18731017. (Winslow, Gabrielle)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Winslow, Gabrielle)
October 1, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam Travel Services, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Travel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra N Rose
Represented By: Jeiel Noh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Gabrielle Winslow
Represented By: Amy S. Rubin
Represented By: Joseph Edward Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?