Lavold v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Cassandra V. Lavold
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv05226
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cummings
Referring Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cummings and defendant has filed the administrative record. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision of the ALJ is to be filed by 1/28/2022. Defendant's response to be filed by 3/14/2022. Plaintiff's reply, if any, to be filed by 3/28/22. Mailed notice (cc, )
November 26, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Kelly, Kathryn)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/15/2021. (rp, ) Modified on 10/15/2021 (rp, ).
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge #9 filed on 10/13/2021, the initial status hearing set for 12/17/2021 is stricken. Executive Committee Order to follow. Emailed notice (cdh, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Kelly, Kathryn)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 12/13/2021. Initial telephone conference is set for 12/17/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The facts sworn to in the application demonstrate that Plaintiff's income is near or below the poverty level for a household of one, see https://aspe.hhs.gov/povertyguidelines, and that Plaintiff does not have substantial assets. The Court will not appoint the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendant, because Plaintiff is represented by counsel. See #3 . Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/7/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The facts sworn to in the application demonstrate that Plaintiff's income is near or below the poverty level for a household of one, see https://aspe.hhs.gov/povertyguidelines, and that Plaintiff does not have substantial assets. The Court will not appoint the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendant, because Plaintiff is represented by counsel. See #3 . Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/5/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Cassandra V. Lavold for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cassandra V. Lavold by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cassandra V. Lavold; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
October 4, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavold v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra V. Lavold
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?