Stewart v. Connelly et al
Plaintiff: John Stewart and John E Stewart, Jr
Defendant: David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. and Central Garden and Pet Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv05240
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John E Stewart, Jr by John Howard Bickley, Iv (Bickley, John)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties have agreed to the following briefing schedule on the Motion to Dismiss and the Motion to Strike: Plaintiff has until 11/30/2021 to respond; Defendants have until 12/14/2021 to reply to Plaintiff's Response. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion to substitute attorney #14 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff John E Stewart, Jr to substitute attorney Steven C. Armbruster (Bickley, John)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead, instanter #8 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation to dismiss Counts II and III Of Plaintiff's Complaint at Law with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit)(Kelleher, Madeline)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation to strike Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kelleher, Madeline)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 DAVID CONNELL'S ANSWER to Complaint by David Connelly(Kelleher, Madeline)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Central Garden and Pet Company(Kelleher, Madeline)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for extension of time to file answer instanter (Kelleher, Madeline)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for extension of time to answer #5 is granted. Defendants are to file their responsive pleadings by 11/1/2021. By 12/13/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead, MOTION by Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for extension of time to file , MOTION by Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for extension of time to file response/reply , MOTION by Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for leave to file excess pages (Kelleher, Madeline)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation by Lew Reuben Charles Bricker (Bricker, Lew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation by Madeline Fairfax Kelleher (Kelleher, Madeline)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelleher, Madeline)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2021L007214) filed by Central Garden and Pet Company, David Connelly, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18734835. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal Exhibits)(Kelleher, Madeline)
October 4, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Connelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Stewart, Jr
Represented By: John Howard Bickley, Iv
Represented By: Steven C Armbruster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Connelly
Represented By: Lew Reuben Charles Bricker
Represented By: Madeline Fairfax Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Lew Reuben Charles Bricker
Represented By: Madeline Fairfax Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Represented By: Lew Reuben Charles Bricker
Represented By: Madeline Fairfax Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Garden and Pet Company
Represented By: Lew Reuben Charles Bricker
Represented By: Madeline Fairfax Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?