Almond v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Valerie Almond, ex rel., L.G., a minor and Valerie Almond
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv05257
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sheila M Finnegan
Referring Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record (no motion required). The Social Security Administration's motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support are due 45 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice (sxw)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. This action (1) is neither frivolous nor malicious; (2) states a claim on which relief may be granted; and (3) seeks damages against a defendant who is not immune from such relief. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii). See also Manning v. Arizona, No. 12 C 1019, 2012 WL 1161506, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 9, 2012). In addition, the facts set forth in Plaintiff's affidavit demonstrate that Plaintiff has met the burden of establishing indigence. Mailed notice (sxw)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Sheila Finnegan, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge John F. Kness no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable John F. Kness on 10/14/2021.(daj, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: As the parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge for all further proceedings #6 , all deadlines and hearings set before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Scott Dennis Heffron as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Heffron, Scott)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Valerie Almond, ex rel., L.G., a minor for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Valerie Almond, ex rel., L.G., a minor by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Valerie Almond, ex rel., L.G., a minor; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
October 5, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almond v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Almond, ex rel., L.G., a minor
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Almond
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Scott Dennis Heffron
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?