Renderos et al v. Clearview AI, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais, Suarez Rojas, Reyna Maldonado, Lisa Knox, Mijente Support Committee and Norcal Resist Fund
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc., et al., Alameda County District Attorney, Alameda Police Department, El Segundo Police Department and Antioch Police Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv05286
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 31 MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to all counsel of record. (gcy, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 30 RECEIVED from California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-04572 (gcy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 29 MDL Transfer Order. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant City of Alameda's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Alameda Police Department. (Cohen, Alan) (Filed on 7/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The Court previously stayed the case. Dkt. No. 24. The remand hearing that was noticed for August 19, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/15/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand filed by Alameda County District Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/28/2021. Replies due by 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wenzel, Michael) (Filed on 7/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand filed by Antioch Police Department. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/28/2021. Replies due by 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowry, Ethanluke) (Filed on 7/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The case is stayed in all respects pending resolution of the JPML proceedings. The July 29, 2021 hearing on the motion to remand is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/7/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #12 Stipulation Further Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Defendants County of Alameda and City of Antiochs Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Antioch Police Department. (Lowry, Ethanluke) (Filed on 7/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand ) filed byLisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 7/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Clearview AI, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Lichtman in Support of Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order)(Spelman, Kate) (Filed on 6/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sejal R. Zota. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Sejal Zota ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16124165.) filed by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing)(Zota, Sejal) (Filed on 6/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by El Segundo Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Filed on 6/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 17 OBJECTIONS to Conditional Transfer Order by Alameda County District Attorney. (Wenzel, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS to Conditional Transfer Order by Antioch Police Department. (Lowry, Ethanluke) (Filed on 6/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #13 ) filed by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/8/2021. Replies due by 7/15/2021. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 6/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles Wenzel on behalf of County of Alameda (Wenzel, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 *Erroneous Entry - Please See Document #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/8/2021. Replies due by 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leonida, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Knox, #4 Declaration of Maldonado, #5 Proposed Order)(Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 6/24/2021) Modified on 6/28/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Re Defendants County of Alameda and City of Antioch's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Alameda County District Attorney, Antioch Police Department. (Lowry, Ethanluke) (Filed on 6/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Motion to Extend Time to Respond. Defendant Clearview AI, Inc. need not file a response to plaintiffs' complaint pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/22/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Order re #9 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint ) filed byLisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint filed by Clearview AI, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Licthman in Support of Defendant Clearview AI, Inc's Motion to Extend Time to Respond, #2 Proposed Order)(Spelman, Kate) (Filed on 6/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais.. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 6/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Clearview AI, Inc., et al. (Spelman, Kate) (Filed on 6/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Alameda Superior Court with jury demand. Their case number is RG21096898. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16075629). Filed byClearview AI, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spelman, Kate) (Filed on 6/14/2021) Modified on 6/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renderos et al v. Clearview AI, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Renderos
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria Thais
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suarez Rojas
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyna Maldonado
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Knox
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mijente Support Committee
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norcal Resist Fund
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Gunnar Karl Martz
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc., et al.
Represented By: Kate Tainsky Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County District Attorney
Represented By: Michael Charles Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda Police Department
Represented By: Alan M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Segundo Police Department
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Police Department
Represented By: Ethanluke M Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?