Cruz et al v. Pritzker et al
Plaintiff: Robert Cruz and Scot Jones
Defendant: Governor J.B. Pritzker, Carmen I Ayala and Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board
Case Number: 1:2021cv05311
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY by Defendants Carmen I Ayala, J.B. Pritzker in Support of the Motion to Dismiss [ECF 11] (Vandam, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY by Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Wilder, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Thomas Tarter #20 is due on or before 11/22/21. Defendants' reply brief is due on or before 12/13/21. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Robert Cruz, Scot Jones in Opposition to motion to dismiss #14 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 (Wallace, Steven)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' reply brief in support of their motion for preliminary injunction #8 is due on or before 11/19/21. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants to file a reply to plaintiffs' motion for entry of preliminary injunction #8 by 10/22/2021. The briefing schedule previously entered on defendants' motion to dismiss #11 , #14 and motion to bar #20 is stricken. Plaintiffs to file responses to the motions on or before 11/5/2021. Defendants to file replies on or before 11/19/2021. Defendants Carmen I Ayala, J.B. Pritzker's motion for leave to file oversize brief instanter #22 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants Carmen I Ayala, J.B. Pritzker for leave to file excess pages | Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief Instanter (Vandam, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Carmen I Ayala, J.B. Pritzker in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction, #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Bleasdale Decl.))(Vandam, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Carmen I Ayala, J.B. Pritzker to bar | Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Thomas Tarter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandam, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board by Robert R. Wilder (Wilder, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board by Burton S. Odelson (Odelson, Burton)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MAILED Rule 83.15 letter to to all counel of record. (gcy, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RECEIVED from Illinois Central; Case Number 3:21-cv-03199 (gcy)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION and ORDER granting #6 Motion to Change Venue entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/5/2021. Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board's Motion to Transfer Venue, d/e #6 is GRANTED. This case is transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION and ORDER) (MAS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification regarding #9 Notice of Appearance of Attorney: Clerk replaced d/e 9 with the proper Adobe pdf formatted document. (MAS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board. Responses due by 10/14/2021 (McGrath, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Notice of Filing)(McGrath, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Carmen I Ayala, JB Pritzker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(VanDam, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Carmen I Ayala, JB Pritzker. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (VanDam, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiffs Robert Cruz, Scot Jones. (Wallace, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board has filed a Motion to Change Venue to the Northern District of Illinois. (d/e #6 ). Plaintiffs Robert Cruz and Scot Jones have, in response, filed a Memorandum in Opposition in which they oppose the change of venue. (d/e #10 ). Defendant Oak Lawn is DIRECTED to file, by Wednesday, September 29, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., a reply addressing the arguments Plaintiffs assert in their memorandum. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 9/24/2021. (MAS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey J VanDam on behalf of Carmen I Ayala, JB Pritzker (VanDam, Jeffrey) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/5/2021) (MAS). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Robert Cruz, Scot Jones. Responses due by 10/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Tarter, M.D., #2 Exhibit Combined Exhibits to Motion)(Wallace, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven M Wallace on behalf of Robert Cruz, Scot Jones (Wallace, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(McGrath, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael John McGrath on behalf of Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board (McGrath, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas J Verticchio on behalf of Carmen I Ayala, JB Pritzker (Verticchio, Thomas) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Laura K Bautista on behalf of Carmen I Ayala, JB Pritzker (Bautista, Laura) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet (Bautista, Laura) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 7th Judicial Circuit Sangamon County, case number 2021CH000087 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3754917), filed by Carmen I Ayala, JB Pritzker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bautista, Laura) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cruz
Represented By: Michael A. Yoder
Represented By: Ricardo Munoz
Represented By: Steven M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scot Jones
Represented By: Michael A. Yoder
Represented By: Ricardo Munoz
Represented By: Steven M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor J.B. Pritzker
Represented By: Thomas J Verticchio
Represented By: Jeffrey J Vandam
Represented By: Laura K Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen I Ayala
Represented By: Thomas J Verticchio
Represented By: Jeffrey J Vandam
Represented By: Laura K Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Lawn Community High School District 229 School Board
Represented By: Michael John McGrath
Represented By: Burton S. Odelson
Represented By: Robert R. Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?