Bumpus v. Air Lines Pilots Association, International et al
Plaintiff: William Michael Bumpus
Defendant: Air Lines Pilots Association, International and United Airlines, Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2021cv05557
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to set a briefing schedule #17 is granted as follows: defendants shall respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #18 by 12/22/21 and response briefs may not exceed 40 pages. Plaintiff's reply and response to any cross-motion for summary judgment shall not exceed 30 pages and is due 1/12/22. No further briefing is allowed, even if defendants file a cross-motion for summary judgment. If the court requires additional briefing, it will alert the parties. No initial status report is necessary. Defendants' responsive pleading is deferred by agreement with plaintiff. The exchange of initial disclosures and all other discovery is deferred. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff William Michael Bumpus for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Plaintiff's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #17 Exhibit Exhibit O to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts)(Spellman, Patrick)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Air Lines Pilots Association, International to set a briefing schedule Joint Motion of All Parties to Establish Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and to Vacate Other Deadlines and Required Reports (Fakhouri, Rami)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18863294. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Required Statement)(Seham, Lee)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 12/30/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 #11 #12 #13 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18837029. (Ellison, Joshua)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18836935. (Ciantra, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18836854. (Lobsenz, James)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Air Lines Pilots Association, International by Rami N Fakhouri (Fakhouri, Rami)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 Re-Filed Exhibit 12 to Plaintiff's Complaint by William Michael Bumpus (Spellman, Patrick)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by William Michael Bumpus. Air Lines Pilots Association, International waiver sent on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/24/2021. (Spellman, Patrick)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc., by Michele Haydel Gehrke NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR MICHELE HAYDEL GEHRKE (Gehrke, Michele)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by William Michael Bumpus. United Airlines, Inc., waiver sent on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/24/2021. (Spellman, Patrick)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18791160. (Granath, Nicholas)
October 20, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Michael Bumpus by Kerry Evan Saltzman (Saltzman, Kerry)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Michael Bumpus by Patrick Michael Spellman (Spellman, Patrick)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spellman, Patrick)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by William Michael Bumpus; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18785352. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14)(Spellman, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumpus v. Air Lines Pilots Association, International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Michael Bumpus
Represented By: Kerry Evan Saltzman
Represented By: Patrick Michael Spellman
Represented By: Lee R. A. Seham
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Granath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Lines Pilots Association, International
Represented By: James K. Lobsenz
Represented By: Joshua J. Ellison
Represented By: Rami N Fakhouri
Represented By: Thomas N. Ciantra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.,
Represented By: Michele Haydel Gehrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?