Alvotech USA Inc. et al v. Abbvie Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alvotech USA Inc. and Alvotech hf.
Defendant: AbbVie Inc and AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd
Case Number: 1:2021cv05645
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 02 U.S.C. ยง 431
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (gcy, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RECEIVED from Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00265 (gcy)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Transfer. Accordingly, the Court FINDS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss MOOT. It is ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/21/2021. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. Case Files electronically transmitted. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Memorandum in Support re #49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer L. Eaton filed by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Eaton, Jennifer) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer L. Eaton by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eaton, Jennifer) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc re #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Declaration re #46 Reply to Response to Motion - Declaration of Herman H. Yue in Support of Defendants' Reply by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31, #5 Exhibit 32)(Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Request for Hearing by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf. re #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Opposition to #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ahmed J. Davis In Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AGREED ORDER granting #40 Motion to Amend/Correct Memorandum in Support. ENTERED AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 6/15/21. (jhie, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #40 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #33 Memorandum in Support (jhie, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Memorandum in Support re #40 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #33 Memorandum in Support filed by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Memorandum)(Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #33 Memorandum in Support by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Pro hac vice for Oulu Wang as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/4/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Pro hac vice for William B. Raich as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/4/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Pro hac vice for Kassandra M. Officer as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/4/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Pro hac vice for Charles Collins-Chase as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/4/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Declaration re #33 Memorandum in Support (Declaration of Herman H. Yue) by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration re #33 Memorandum in Support (Declaration of Sowmyan Ranganathan) by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Mitchell Paul on behalf of Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc (Paul, Dustin) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Oulu Wang and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7821231. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William B. Raich and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7821224. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kassandra M. Officer and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7821217. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Collins-Chase and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7821204. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael A. Morin as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/1/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice for Tara D Elliott as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/1/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice for Herman Heng Yue as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/1/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice for David Penn Frazier as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and Abbvie Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/1/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf. (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tara D. Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7815466. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Morin and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7815457. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David P. Frazier and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7815438. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Herman H. Yue and Certification of Local Counsel Richard H. Ottinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7815417. by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Eaton on behalf of Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc (Eaton, Jennifer) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf. Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021 (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Abbvie Inc. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd.. (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Hooper Ottinger on behalf of Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc (Ottinger, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf. Abbvie Inc served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021 (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Martina Tyreus Hufnal as to Alvotech USA Inc. and Alvotech hf. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 5/19/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jonathan Singer as to Alvotech USA Inc. and Alvotech hf. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 5/19/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Douglas Edward McCann as to Alvotech USA Inc. and Alvotech hf. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 5/19/21. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. District Judge Robert G. Doumar no longer assigned to the case. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Martina Tyreus Hufnal and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7792166. by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Singer and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7790766. by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Edward McCann and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7788112. by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Abbvie Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(jhie, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:21cv589. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons to AbbVie Inc. by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7780694.), filed by Alvotech USA Inc., Alvotech hf.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Ahmed) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvotech USA Inc. et al v. Abbvie Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvotech USA Inc.
Represented By: Ahmed Jamal Davis
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Represented By: Jonathan Singer
Represented By: Martina Tyreus Hufnal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvotech hf.
Represented By: Ahmed Jamal Davis
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Represented By: Jonathan Singer
Represented By: Martina Tyreus Hufnal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc
Represented By: Dustin Mitchell Paul
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Eaton
Represented By: Richard Hooper Ottinger
Represented By: Charles Collins-Chase
Represented By: David Penn Frazier
Represented By: Herman Heng Yue
Represented By: Kassandra M. Officer
Represented By: Michael A. Morin
Represented By: Oulu Wang
Represented By: Tara D. Elliott
Represented By: William B. Raich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd
Represented By: Dustin Mitchell Paul
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Eaton
Represented By: Richard Hooper Ottinger
Represented By: Charles Collins-Chase
Represented By: David Penn Frazier
Represented By: Herman Heng Yue
Represented By: Kassandra M. Officer
Represented By: Michael A. Morin
Represented By: Oulu Wang
Represented By: Tara D. Elliott
Represented By: William B. Raich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?