Shinners v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Amanda Louise Shinners
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv05775
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sunil R Harjani
Referring Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: The following schedule shall govern the proceedings in this case: (1) Defendant shall file the administrative record by 1/10/2022; (2) Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision is due by 3/11/2022; (3) Defendant's motion to affirm the decision and his brief in support are due by 4/25/2022; and (4) Plaintiff's reply brief is due by 5/9/2022. Defendant shall submit a courtesy copy of the administrative record to Judge Harjani's chambers (Room 1870). The parties must include in their briefs a list of the questions presented in support of remand or affirmance. Stating simply that the ALJ's decision is or is not supported by substantial evidence is not sufficient. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week prior to the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 11/9/2021: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs #3 is granted. [For further detail see attached order.] Mailed notice(lxs, )
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/5/2021. (lma, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Spector, Deborah)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Ling, Ernest)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Louise Shinners by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Louise Shinners by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Louise Shinners by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Amanda Louise Shinners for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Spector, Deborah)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amanda Louise Shinners; (Spector, Deborah)
October 28, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinners v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Louise Shinners
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Ernest Yi Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?