Melinta Therapeutics, LLC et al v. Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, Melinta Subsidiary Corp. and Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Nexus pharmaceuticals, Inc., PHV IMRON T. ALY, PHV JOEL M. WALLACE, PHV HA KUNG WONG, PHV DAMIEN N. DOMBROWSKI, PHV MONICA CHOU, Imron T Aly, Joel M Wallace, Ha Kung Wong, Damien N Dombrowski and Monica Shou
Case Number: 1:2021cv05995
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 46 MAIL RETURNED, for document #41 sent to James S. Richter returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (jg, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing set for 12/3/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 30, 2021 Filing 44 STATUS Report by Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Melinta Therapeutics, LLC, Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Anderson, Brian)
November 17, 2021 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Because this case was transferred to this Court on 11/9/2021, the Court strikes the pending motions from the District Court of New Jersey action, including the motions filed under that district's local rules. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, Melinta Subsidiary Corp., Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Brian Neil Anderson (Anderson, Brian)
November 10, 2021 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 12/3/2021 at 10:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 40 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Ronald A. Guzman no longer assigned to the case pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 11/10/2021.(daj, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 39 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (nsf, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 38 RECEIVED from New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-11198 (nsf)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER dismissing #35 Motion to Dismiss is MOOT; granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Dismiss; that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois.. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/5/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 36 OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/5/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
November 5, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Complaint. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Complaint by NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of James Richter with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HELEN H. JI, ESQ.; that the application for the pro hac vice admission of Helen H. Ji, Esq. [ECF 32], is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/2/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/10/2021 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2022.;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/7/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 32 Letter from Midlige Richter LLC re pro hac vice application on consent. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen Ji, #2 Declaration of James Richter, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/30/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Filing 30 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Andre M. Espinosa, U.S.M.J. re: Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 29 Letter from Liza M. Walsh Hon. Andre M. Espinosa, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that Plaintiffs' request for expedited discovery on Count I of the Complaint is DENIED; that Defendant's request for a stay of discovery is DENIED; that Plaintiffs' request that the Court order Defendant to provide Plaintiffs with notice of Defendant's launch of its generic product is DENIED; that the Court will hold a status conference on November 10, 2021, at 3:30 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/20/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 27 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2021. Scheduling Order to be filed. (spc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, HA KUNG WONG, DAMIEN N. DOMBROWSKI and MONICA CHOU, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Monica Chou to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12784712.) (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Damien N. Dombrowski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12784707.) (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ha Kung Wong to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12784698.) (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HA KUNG WONG, ESQ., DAMIEN N. DOMBROWSKI, ESQ., AND MONICA CHOU, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/8/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joel M. Wallace to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12781390.) (RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Imron T. Aly to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12781378.) (RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, IMRON T. ALY, ESQ. and JOEL M. WALLACE, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 20 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER -- The telephonic R16 conference scheduled in DE #15 Order will now take place on Friday September 10, 2021 at 10:00 AM with the same call in information. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/2/2021. (spc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Andre M. Espinosa, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ha Kung Wong, #2 Certification of Damien N. Dombrowski, #3 Certification of Monica Chou, #4 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF IMRON T. ALY, ESQ. AND JOEL M. WALLACE, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 8/30/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from Midlige Richter LLC re pro hac vice application on consent. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Imron Aly, #2 Declaration of Joel Wallace, #3 Declaration of James Richter, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 9/8/2021 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 8/13/2021. (spc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) and to transfer venue (RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Midlige Richter to the Honorable Andre M. Espinosa, USMJ re response re #11 Letter. (RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) and to transfer venue (Corrected) (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Hon. Andre M. Espinoza, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) and to transfer venue (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) and to transfer venue. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) and to transfer venue by NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of James Richter with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/1/2021. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP.. NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP., MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP., MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12461448), filed by MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 AO120 Form)(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melinta Therapeutics, LLC et al v. Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: Brian Neil Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinta Subsidiary Corp.
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: Brian Neil Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rempex Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: Brian Neil Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexus pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV IMRON T. ALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV JOEL M. WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV HA KUNG WONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV DAMIEN N. DOMBROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV MONICA CHOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imron T Aly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ha Kung Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien N Dombrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Shou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?